Digital Cache, LLC v. LTL Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Digital Cache, LLC
Defendant: LTL Group, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv02592
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for LTL Group, Inc. 11/5/2021.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(jegonzalez, 4)
September 23, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Serve a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement by LTL Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Li, Yaou)
September 23, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Yaou Li on behalf of LTL Group, Inc., filed. (Li, Yaou)
September 3, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Digital Cache, LLC, filed.(Rabicoff, Isaac)
August 11, 2021 Filing 7 US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JacquelineMataadi, 4)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/12/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(JacquelineMataadi, 4)
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to LTL Group, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
August 10, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to LTL Group, Inc., filed.(Rabicoff, Isaac)
August 10, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Digital Cache, LLC, filed.(Rabicoff, Isaac)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Isaac Rabicoff on behalf of Digital Cache, LLC, filed. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LTL Group, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26874348) filed by Digital Cache, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Digital Cache, LLC v. LTL Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Digital Cache, LLC
Represented By: Isaac Philip Rabicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LTL Group, Inc.
Represented By: Yaou Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?