Terrence Richardson et al v. WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C. et al
Defendant: WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., Walmart Inc., JOHN DOE and Jane Doe
Petitioner: Dennis Stewart and Terrence Richardson
Case Number: 4:2021cv02793
Filed: August 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2023 *** All exhibits retrieved by counsel from the courtroom July 11, 2023, filed. (ledwards, 4)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER to provide meal to jury on July 11, 2023(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
July 11, 2023 Filing 130 RESPONSE in Opposition to #123 MOTION to Alter Judgment, filed by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hicks, Jamal)
July 11, 2023 Filing 129 REPLY in Support of #67 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Expert Report, filed by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart. (Hicks, Jamal)
July 11, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alfred H Bennett. Second Day day of JURY TRIAL held on 7/11/2023. Jury panel of eight entered the courtroom at approximately 8:55 a.m. Parties announced settlement on the record. Jury released at 9:05 a.m. Appearances: Jamal Jarrard Hicks, Harold Al Odom, III, Benjamin L Hall, III, Zachary David Wilson, Neal Alexander Hoffman, John A. Ramirez.(Court Reporter: D. Smith), filed.(ledwards, 4)
July 11, 2023 Trial settings are terminated. (ledwards, 4)
July 11, 2023 ***Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Jury Trial set for 7/11/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Alfred H Bennett Jury Trial set for 7/12/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Alfred H Bennett Jury Trial set for 7/13/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Alfred H Bennett (ledwards, 4)
July 10, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alfred H Bennett. JURY SELECTION held on 7/10/2023, First day of JURY TRIAL held on 7/10/2023. 9:00 a.m. Court took up admitted exhibits. At approximately 10:00 a.m. Defense requested jury re-shuffle. Panel of 34 entered the courtroom at 11:00 a.m. voir dire began. Jury released for lunch 1:00 pm to 2:00 p.m. A jury of 8 was seated at 3:15 p.m. The court breaks 3:45 pm - 4 pm. Opening statements began at 4:05 pm. Court adjourned at 4:35 p.m. Trial to resume Tuesday, July 11, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. Appearances: Jamal Jarrard Hicks, Harold Al Odom, III, Benjamin L Hall, III, Zachary David Wilson, Neal Alexander Hoffman, John A. Ramirez.(Court Reporter: D. Smith), filed.(ledwards, 4)
July 10, 2023 Filing 128 MOTION for Protective Order by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Hall, Benjamin)
July 10, 2023 Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Finnegan on behalf of Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed. (Hall, Benjamin)
July 9, 2023 Filing 126 MOTION Plaintiffs Motion to Allow Live Testimony of J. Patrick Murphy and Dr. Gabriel Schwartz via Contemporaneous Transmission by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hicks, Jamal)
July 9, 2023 Filing 125 Supplemental Exhibit List by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 52, #2 Exhibit 53-57, #3 Exhibit 58-61, #4 Exhibit 62, #5 Exhibit 63, #6 Exhibit 64)(Hall, Benjamin)
July 9, 2023 Filing 124 RESPONSE to #121 Document, Walmart's Response to Plaintiffs' Confirmation of Deposition Agreement Regarding Deposition Testimony of Tracy Ballard as Corporate Representative, filed by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C.. (Ramirez, John)
July 9, 2023 Filing 123 MOTION to Alter Judgment by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., Walmart Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/31/2023. (Hoffman, Neal)
July 9, 2023 Filing 122 STATEMENT regarding pending expert-related motions re: #59 MOTION to Exclude Expert Witnesses, #67 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Expert Report, #63 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement Expert Report by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., Walmart Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A)(Hoffman, Neal)
July 8, 2023 Filing 121 Confirmation of Deposition Agreement with Walmarts Counsel Regarding Deposition Testimony of Tracy Ballard as Walmart Corporate Representative by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Hall, Benjamin)
July 8, 2023 Filing 120 Plaintiffs Amended Trial Deposition Designation for Shane Molen by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed.(Hicks, Jamal)
July 7, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alfred H Bennett. DOCKET CALL held on 7/7/2023. Pending issues taken up and exhibits admitted as stated on the record. Remaining issues to be taken up Monday, July 10, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. Voir dire to begin at 10:00 a.m. Appearances: Jamal Jarrard Hicks, Harold Al Odom, III, Benjamin L Hall, III, Zachary David Wilson, Neal Alexander Hoffman, John A. Ramirez.(Court Reporter: D. Smith), filed.(ledwards, 4)
July 7, 2023 Filing 119 Plaintiffs Amended Trial Deposition Designation for Joseph Mathew by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed.(Hicks, Jamal)
July 7, 2023 Filing 118 Plaintiffs Amended Trial Deposition Designation for Zihua David Tang by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed.(Hicks, Jamal)
July 7, 2023 Filing 117 Plaintiffs' Deposition Objections by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed.(Hicks, Jamal)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER denying #55 Motion for Leave to File; granting in part and denying in part #60 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting #61 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot #62 Motion for Judgment.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
July 7, 2023 Filing 115 Supplemental Exhibit List by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart(Hicks, Jamal)
July 5, 2023 Filing 114 REPLY in Support of #62 MOTION for 12(c) Judgment on the Pleadings Judgment, filed by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., Walmart Inc.. (Hoffman, Neal)
July 5, 2023 Filing 113 REPLY in Support of #61 MOTION for Summary Judgment regarding Terence Richardson, filed by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., Walmart Inc.. (Hoffman, Neal)
July 5, 2023 Filing 112 REPLY in Support of #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment regarding Dennis Stewart, filed by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. R, #2 Exhibit Ex. S)(Hoffman, Neal)
July 5, 2023 Filing 111 OBJECTIONS to #103 Response in Opposition to Motion, #102 Response in Opposition to Motion , filed by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Ramirez, John)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting #79 Motion to Withdraw #78 Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan,.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
June 30, 2023 Filing 109 Agreed Proposed Pretrial Order by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart(Hicks, Jamal)
June 30, 2023 Filing 108 MOTION In Limine by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/21/2023. (Ramirez, John)
June 30, 2023 Filing 107 MOTION In Limine by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/21/2023. (Hicks, Jamal)
June 27, 2023 Filing 106 Proposed Jury Charge by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart(Hicks, Jamal)
June 27, 2023 Filing 105 Proposed Voir Dire Questions(Hicks, Jamal)
June 27, 2023 Filing 104 RESPONSE in Opposition to #62 MOTION for 12(c) Judgment on the Pleadings Judgment, filed by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hicks, Jamal)
June 27, 2023 Filing 103 RESPONSE in Opposition to #61 MOTION for Summary Judgment regarding Terence Richardson, filed by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Hicks, Jamal)
June 27, 2023 Filing 102 RESPONSE in Opposition to #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment regarding Dennis Stewart, filed by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Hicks, Jamal)
June 25, 2023 Filing 101 Deposition Designation - Amy Chapman by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed.(Hicks, Jamal)
June 25, 2023 Filing 100 Deposition Designation - Cesar Magallon by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed.(Hicks, Jamal)
June 25, 2023 Filing 99 Deposition Designation - Zihua "David" Tang by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed.(Hicks, Jamal)
June 25, 2023 Filing 98 Deposition Designation - Joseph Mathew by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed.(Hicks, Jamal)
June 25, 2023 Filing 97 Deposition Designation- Shane Molen by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed.(Hicks, Jamal)
June 25, 2023 Filing 96 Deposition Designation - Jonathan Brodeur by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed.(Hicks, Jamal)
June 25, 2023 Filing 95 Deposition Designation - Tracy Ballard by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed.(Hicks, Jamal)
June 25, 2023 Filing 94 Witness List by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart(Hicks, Jamal)
June 25, 2023 Filing 93 Exhibit List by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart(Hicks, Jamal)
June 23, 2023 Filing 92 Walmart's Deposition Designations of Zihua David Tang by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., filed.(Ramirez, John)
June 23, 2023 Filing 91 Walmart's Deposition Designations of Joseph Mathew by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., filed.(Ramirez, John)
June 23, 2023 Filing 90 Walmart's Deposition Designations of Jared Newman by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., filed.(Ramirez, John)
June 23, 2023 Filing 89 Walmart's Deposition Designations of Shane Molen by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., filed.(Ramirez, John)
June 23, 2023 Filing 88 Walmart's Objections Regarding the Deposition Testimony of Tracy Ballard by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., filed.(Ramirez, John)
June 23, 2023 Filing 87 Walmart's Deposition Objections by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., filed.(Ramirez, John)
June 23, 2023 Filing 86 Proposed Voir Dire Questions(Ramirez, John)
June 23, 2023 Filing 85 Proposed Jury Charge by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C.(Ramirez, John)
June 23, 2023 Filing 84 Witness List by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C.(Ramirez, John)
June 23, 2023 Filing 83 Exhibit List by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C.(Ramirez, John)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #69 Motion for Extension of Time; Motion-related deadline set re: #69 MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Motions for Summary Judgment, Judgment on the Pleadings, and Exclusion of Expert Witnesses, #76 MOTION for Leave to File Responses to Defendants Three Dispositive Motions.; granting #76 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
June 14, 2023 Filing 81 RESPONSE in Opposition to #76 MOTION for Leave to File Responses to Defendants Three Dispositive Motions, filed by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order)(Ramirez, John)
June 6, 2023 Filing 80 RESPONSE in Opposition to #67 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Expert Report, filed by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order Order)(Ramirez, John)
May 31, 2023 Filing 79 MOTION to Withdraw #78 JointDiscovery/Case Management Plan by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/21/2023. (Hoffman, Neal)
May 31, 2023 Filing 78 WITHDRAWN by Order Doc #110 Agreed JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Docket Control and Scheduling Order)(Hoffman, Neal) Modified on 7/5/2023 (ledwards, 4).
May 30, 2023 Filing 77 REPLY in Support of #59 MOTION to Exclude Expert Witnesses, filed by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., Walmart Inc.. (Hoffman, Neal)
May 24, 2023 Filing 76 MOTION for Leave to File Responses to Defendants Three Dispositive Motions by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Hicks, Jamal)
May 24, 2023 Filing 75 REPLY in Support of #62 MOTION for 12(c) Judgment on the Pleadings Judgment, filed by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., Walmart Inc.. (Hoffman, Neal)
May 24, 2023 Filing 74 REPLY in Support of #61 MOTION for Summary Judgment regarding Terence Richardson, filed by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., Walmart Inc.. (Hoffman, Neal)
May 24, 2023 Filing 73 REPLY in Support of #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment regarding Dennis Stewart, filed by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., Walmart Inc.. (Hoffman, Neal)
May 23, 2023 Filing 72 REPLY to Response to #69 MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Motions for Summary Judgment, Judgment on the Pleadings, and Exclusion of Expert Witnesses, filed by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart. (Hicks, Jamal)
May 22, 2023 Filing 71 RESPONSE to #59 MOTION to Exclude Expert Witnesses filed by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hicks, Jamal)
May 22, 2023 Filing 70 RESPONSE in Opposition to #69 MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Motions for Summary Judgment, Judgment on the Pleadings, and Exclusion of Expert Witnesses, filed by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D, #5 Proposed Order Order)(Hoffman, Neal)
May 22, 2023 Filing 69 MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Motions for Summary Judgment, Judgment on the Pleadings, and Exclusion of Expert Witnesses by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/12/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hicks, Jamal)
May 18, 2023 Filing 68 RESPONSE in Opposition to #63 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement Expert Report, filed by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Stewart Depo Excerpt, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Richardson Depo Excerpt, #3 Proposed Order)(Wilson, Zachary)
May 16, 2023 Filing 67 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Expert Report by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hicks, Jamal)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Extension of Time; Motion-related deadline set re: #65 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Responding to Defendants' Motions. Responses due by 5/22/2023.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
May 8, 2023 Filing 65 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Responding to Defendants' Motions by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hicks, Jamal)
April 27, 2023 Filing 64 MOTION for Entry of Order re: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT DR. JONATHAN MORRIS EXPERT REPORTS by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/18/2023. (Hicks, Jamal)
April 27, 2023 Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement Expert Report by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/18/2023. (Hicks, Jamal)
April 24, 2023 Filing 62 MOTION for 12(c) Judgment on the Pleadings Judgment by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., Walmart Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/15/2023. (Hoffman, Neal)
April 24, 2023 Filing 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment regarding Terence Richardson by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., Walmart Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/15/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D, #5 Exhibit Ex. E, #6 Exhibit Ex. F, #7 Exhibit Ex. G, #8 Exhibit Ex. H, #9 Exhibit Ex. I, #10 Exhibit Ex. J, #11 Exhibit Ex. K, #12 Exhibit Ex. L, #13 Exhibit Ex. M, #14 Exhibit Ex. N, #15 Exhibit Ex. O, #16 Exhibit Ex. P, #17 Exhibit Ex. Q)(Hoffman, Neal)
April 24, 2023 Filing 60 MOTION for Summary Judgment regarding Dennis Stewart by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., Walmart Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/15/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D, #5 Exhibit Ex. E, #6 Exhibit Ex. F, #7 Exhibit Ex. G, #8 Exhibit Ex. H, #9 Exhibit Ex. I, #10 Exhibit Ex. J, #11 Exhibit Ex. K, #12 Exhibit Ex. L, #13 Exhibit Ex. M, #14 Exhibit Ex. N, #15 Exhibit Ex. O, #16 Exhibit Ex. P, #17 Exhibit Ex. Q)(Hoffman, Neal)
April 24, 2023 Filing 59 MOTION to Exclude Expert Witnesses by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., Walmart Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/15/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Exclude Experts)(Wilson, Zachary)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #57 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
April 5, 2023 Filing 57 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., Walmart Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/26/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Hoffman, Neal)
March 31, 2023 Filing 56 RESPONSE in Opposition to #55 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, filed by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D, #5 Exhibit Ex. E, #6 Exhibit Ex. F, #7 Exhibit Ex. G, #8 Exhibit Ex. H, #9 Exhibit Ex. I, #10 Exhibit Ex. J, #11 Proposed Order Order)(Hoffman, Neal)
March 17, 2023 Filing 55 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Hicks, Jamal)
March 17, 2023 Filing 54 Agreed MOTION to Withdraw #53 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/7/2023. (Hicks, Jamal)
March 7, 2023 Filing 53 WITHDRAWN by doc #54 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 5)(Hicks, Jamal) Modified on 3/28/2023 (ledwards, 4).
December 7, 2022 Filing 52 DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS LIST by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., Walmart Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Wilson, Zachary)
October 28, 2022 Filing 51 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed.(Hicks, Jamal)
October 28, 2022 Filing 50 Expert Report of 1 by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed.(Hicks, Jamal)
October 28, 2022 Filing 49 DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS LIST by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed.(Hicks, Jamal)
October 13, 2022 Filing 48 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., with Jury Demand by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., filed.(Ramirez, John)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying #20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim.Accordingly, Defendants' 12(b)(l) Motion is GRANTED. Defendants' 12(b)(6) Motion is DENIED as to Stewmi's 1981, 2000a, 2000a-2, negligence, and assault claims; but GRANTED as to Plaintiffs' 1983 claim and Stewmi' s DTP A claims..(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #43 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order as to #22 Scheduling Order. ( Pltf Expert Report due by 10/28/2022. Deft Expert Report due by 12/7/2022.)(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(JosephWells, 4)
August 25, 2022 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition to #43 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order as to #22 Scheduling Order,, filed by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C.. (Wilson, Zachary)
August 16, 2022 Filing 44 DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS LIST by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-7)(Hicks, Jamal)
August 12, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alfred H Bennett. DISCOVERY HEARING held on 8/12/2022. Defendants assertions of privilege in privilege log (Doc. #38) are SUSTAINED. Appearances: Jamal Hicks and Zachary Wilson. (Court Reporter: K. Miller), filed.(rguerrero, 4)
August 8, 2022 Filing 43 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order as to #22 Scheduling Order, by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hicks, Jamal)
August 4, 2022 Filing 42 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Discovery Hearing set for 8/12/2022 at 10:30 AM in by telephone before Judge Alfred H Bennett, filed. (ledwards, 4)
July 22, 2022 Filing 41 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Discovery Hearing set for 8/5/2022 at 11:00 AM in by telephone before Judge Alfred H Bennett, filed. (ledwards, 4)
April 5, 2022 Filing 40 NOTICE OF FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURES by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., filed. (Wilson, Zachary)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Agreed Stipulated Confidentiality Order (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
February 24, 2022 Filing 38 Privilege Log by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., Walmart Inc., filed.(Ramirez, John)
February 23, 2022 Filing 37 Agreed PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Confidentiality, filed.(Ramirez, John)
February 1, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE of Attorney Vacation by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed. (Hall, Benjamin)
January 19, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jan Smith by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena)(Hicks, Jamal)
January 4, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jan Smith by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena to Testify at Deposition)(Hicks, Jamal)
January 3, 2022 Filing 33 STATUS REPORT by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., filed.(Ramirez, John)
December 20, 2021 Filing 32 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed.(Hicks, Jamal)
December 20, 2021 Filing 31 REPLY in Support of #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., Walmart Inc.. (Hoffman, Neal)
December 20, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., filed. (Ramirez, John)
December 13, 2021 Filing 29 RESPONSE to #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart. (Hall, Benjamin)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER. Request for expedited hearing is denied. The parties will submit a joint status report regarding the issue within 30 days. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
November 30, 2021 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To File Response to Defendants' Motions for Partial Dismissal by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hall, Benjamin)
November 26, 2021 Filing 25 STATUS REPORT by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., Walmart Inc., filed.(Hoffman, Neal)
November 26, 2021 Filing 24 STATUS REPORT by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed.(Hicks, Jamal)
November 23, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Terria M. Hutchinson on behalf of WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., filed. (Hutchinson, Terria)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 2/17/2022. Pltf Expert Report due by 8/16/2022. Deft Expert Report due by 9/26/2022. Discovery due by 1/24/2023. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 4/24/2023. Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/16/2023. Docket Call set for 7/7/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. Trial set for 7/10/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
November 19, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alfred H Bennett. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 11/19/2021. Dates agreed, scheduling order to follow. Appearances: Jamal Jarrard Hicks, Harold Al Odom, III, Benjamin L Hall, III, Neal Alexander Hoffman.(Court Reporter: H. Alcaraz), filed.(ledwards, 4)
November 18, 2021 Filing 21 Agreed PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order re: #4 Order for Initial Conference - FORM,, filed.(Ramirez, John)
November 11, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., Walmart Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/2/2021. (Ramirez, John)
November 10, 2021 Filing 19 Amended JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., filed.(Ramirez, John)
November 10, 2021 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., filed.(Ramirez, John)
November 10, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., filed.(Ramirez, John)
November 9, 2021 Filing 16 Ex Parte JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Hicks, Jamal)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying as moot #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
October 29, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hall, Benjamin)
October 29, 2021 Filing 13 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against JOHN DOE, WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., Walmart Inc. filed by Dennis Stewart, Terrence Richardson. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5)(Hall, Benjamin)
October 8, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/29/2021. (Ramirez, John)
October 6, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Harold A. "Al" Odom III on behalf of Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed. (Odom, Harold)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time Responses due by 10/8/2021.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
September 15, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Ramirez on behalf of WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., filed. (Ramirez, John)
September 14, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To File Responsive Pleading by WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., Walmart Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Hoffman, Neal)
September 9, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Terrence Richardson, filed.(Hicks, Jamal)
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Walmart Inc. served on 9/1/2021, answer due 9/22/2021, filed.(Hicks, Jamal)
September 7, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C. served on 9/1/2021, answer due 9/22/2021, filed.(Hicks, Jamal)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/19/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
August 27, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C., Walmart Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
August 26, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Terrence Richardson, Dennis Stewart, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation)(Hall, Benjamin)
August 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dennis Stewart, Terrence Richardson (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26953850) filed by Dennis Stewart, Terrence Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Unredacted attachment Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet)(Hall, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terrence Richardson et al v. WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WalMart Stores, Texas L.L.C.
Represented By: John A. Ramirez
Represented By: Neal Alexander Hoffman
Represented By: Zachary David Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Neal Alexander Hoffman
Represented By: Zachary David Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dennis Stewart
Represented By: Benjamin L Hall, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Terrence Richardson
Represented By: Benjamin L Hall, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?