UOP LLC et al v. Exterran Energy Solutions, LP et al
Plaintiff: UOP LLC and UOP Russell LLC
Defendant: Exterran Energy Solutions, L.P. and Exterran Corporation
Case Number: 4:2021cv02804
Filed: August 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Christina A Bryan
Referring Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 34 Case transferred in from Texas Western. Case Number 7:20-cv-00233; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #14 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge David Counts. (ja)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #24 MOTION to Compel Adequate Identification of Alleged Trade Secrets filed by Exterran Corporation, Exterran Energy Solutions, LP. Signed by Judge David Counts.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Ronald C. Griffin. (slt)
July 22, 2021 Filing 31 ADR Report Filed - Joint Status Report Regarding Alternative Dispute Resolution by UOP LLC, UOP Russell LLC(Telscher, Rudolph)
June 22, 2021 Filing 30 REPLY to #29 Response in Support of Motion, #26 Response in Opposition to Motion, Plaintiffs Reply ISO of Cross Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents by UOP LLC, UOP Russell LLC. (Telscher, Rudolph) Modified event type on 6/23/2021 (slt).
June 15, 2021 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Support, filed by Exterran Corporation, re #24 MOTION to Compel Adequate Identification of Alleged Trade Secrets filed by Defendant Exterran Corporation, Defendant Exterran Energy Solutions, LP and Response in Opposition re #26 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Kevin)
June 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #25 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge David Counts. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the exhibits attached to the motion under seal. It is so ORDERED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as)
June 11, 2021 Filing 28 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to #25 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document by UOP LLC, UOP Russell LLC. (Telscher, Rudolph)
June 10, 2021 Filing 27 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #25 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (slt)
June 8, 2021 Filing 26 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by UOP LLC, UOP Russell LLC, re #24 MOTION to Compel Adequate Identification of Alleged Trade Secrets filed by Defendant Exterran Corporation, Defendant Exterran Energy Solutions, LP and Cross Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Placeholder, #2 Exhibit 2 Placeholder, #3 Exhibit 3 Exterran Energy Responses to UOP First Set of Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit 4 Exterran Energy Responses to UOP First Set of RFP, #5 Exhibit 5 Exterran Corporation Responses to UOP First Set of Interrogatories, #6 Exhibit 6 Exterran Corporation Responses to UOP First Set of RFP, #7 Proposed Order)(Telscher, Rudolph) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/14/2021) (slt). (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/14/2021) (slt). Modified to replace Exhibits 1 and 2 per Court's Order on 6/13/2021 on 6/14/2021 (slt).
June 8, 2021 Filing 25 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 UOP_0001237 SEALED, #2 Exhibit 2 UOP_0001227 SEALED) (Telscher, Rudolph)
June 1, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Compel Adequate Identification of Alleged Trade Secrets by Exterran Corporation, Exterran Energy Solutions, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defs' 1st ROGS to Pltf UOP, #2 Exhibit B - Pltf UOP's Resps and Objs to Defs' 1st ROGS, #3 Exhibit C - Apr 29 2021 R Hauer Ltr, #4 Exhibit D - May 20 2021 R Hauer Ltr, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defs' Mot to Compel Adequate Identification of Alleged Trade Secrets)(Jacobs, Kevin)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #23 Lindsay Volpenhein Cutie's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. It is further ORDERED that if Ms. Cutie has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
March 2, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Roger J. Fulghum on behalf of Lindsay Volpenhein Cutie ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14543831) by on behalf of Exterran Corporation, Exterran Energy Solutions, LP. (Fulghum, Roger)
February 24, 2021 Filing 22 Proposed Scheduling Order by UOP LLC, UOP Russell LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] SCHEDULING ORDER)(Telscher, Rudolph)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #21 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Scheduling Recommendations. It is ORDERED the time for the parties to file a proposed scheduling order pursuant to Local Rule 16 is extended to February 24, 2021. Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
February 18, 2021 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order by Exterran Corporation, Exterran Energy Solutions, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
February 2, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Support, filed by Exterran Corporation, Exterran Energy Solutions, LP, re #14 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue or Alternatively to Transfer Venue and Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Exterran Energy Solutions, LP (Jacobs, Kevin)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #19 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. It is ORDERED that the time for Defendants, Exterran Energy Solutions, L.P. and Exterran Corporation to respond to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or, In the Alternative, Transfer Venue is extended to February 2, 2021. Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
January 21, 2021 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Exterran Corporation, Exterran Energy Solutions, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
January 19, 2021 Filing 18 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by UOP LLC, UOP Russell LLC, re #14 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue or Alternatively to Transfer Venue and Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Exterran Energy Solutions, LP (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Wilkinson, #2 Proposed Order)(Telscher, Rudolph)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #17 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. It is ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file their response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss no later than January 19, 2021. Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
December 28, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue or Alternatively to Transfer Venue and Motion to Dismiss by UOP LLC, UOP Russell LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Telscher, Rudolph)
December 22, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin T. Jacobs on behalf of Exterran Corporation, Exterran Energy Solutions, LP (Jacobs, Kevin)
December 21, 2020 Filing 15 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Exterran Corporation. (Jacobs, Kevin)
December 21, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue or Alternatively to Transfer Venue and Motion to Dismiss by Exterran Energy Solutions, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Kevin)
December 21, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John A. Jad Davis on behalf of Exterran Corporation, Exterran Energy Solutions, LP (Davis, John)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Kara R. Fussner's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. It is further ORDERED that if Ms. Fussner has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Ryan B. Hauer's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. It is further ORDERED that if Mr. Hauer has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Rudolph A. Telscher, Jr.'s Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. It is further ORDERED that if Mr. Telscher has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 the Parties' Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. It is ORDERED the deadline for Defendants Exterran Energy Solutions, L.P. and Exterran Corporation to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended to on or before December 21, 2020. Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
October 7, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Charles Smith Rudolph A. Telscher, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14048239) by on behalf of UOP LLC, UOP Russell LLC. (Smith, Michael)
October 7, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Charles Smith Ryan B. Hauer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14048230) by on behalf of UOP LLC, UOP Russell LLC. (Smith, Michael)
October 7, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Charles Smith Kara R. Fussner ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14048197) by on behalf of UOP LLC, UOP Russell LLC. (Smith, Michael)
October 7, 2020 Filing 9 Motion For Extension of Time by UOP LLC, UOP Russell LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) Modified event on 10/8/2020 (slt).
October 7, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UOP LLC, UOP Russell LLC. Exterran Corporation served on 9/29/2020, answer due 10/20/2020; Exterran Energy Solutions, LP served on 9/29/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Smith, Michael)
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger J. Fulghum on behalf of Exterran Corporation, Exterran Energy Solutions, LP. Attorney Roger J. Fulghum added to party Exterran Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Roger J. Fulghum added to party Exterran Energy Solutions, LP(pty:dft) (Fulghum, Roger)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Exterran Corporation. (slt)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Exterran Energy Solutions, LP. (slt)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by UOP Russell LLC. (Smith, Michael)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by UOP LLC. (Smith, Michael)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by UOP LLC, UOP Russell LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Smith, Michael)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14014079), filed by UOP LLC, UOP Russell LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Michael)
September 29, 2020 Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (slt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UOP LLC et al v. Exterran Energy Solutions, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UOP LLC
Represented By: Kara R. Fussner
Represented By: Rudolph A. Telscher, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan B. Hauer
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Represented By: Jennifer E Hoekel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UOP Russell LLC
Represented By: Kara R. Fussner
Represented By: Rudolph A. Telscher, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan B. Hauer
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Represented By: Jennifer E Hoekel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exterran Energy Solutions, L.P.
Represented By: John A. Jad Davis
Represented By: Kevin T. Jacobs
Represented By: Lindsay Volpenhein Cutie
Represented By: Roger J Fulghum
Represented By: Kevin Thomas Jacobs
Represented By: Charles Frank Mace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exterran Corporation
Represented By: John A. Jad Davis
Represented By: Kevin T. Jacobs
Represented By: Lindsay Volpenhein Cutie
Represented By: Roger J Fulghum
Represented By: Kevin Thomas Jacobs
Represented By: Charles Frank Mace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?