Fannie Mae v. Huntington Creek Capital IV, LLC
Plaintiff: Fannie Mae
Defendant: HUNTINGTON CREEK CAPITAL IV, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv02819
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE Receiver's October 2021 Report by Michael F. Flanagan, filed. (Brookner, Jason)
September 24, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Receiver's September 2021 Report by Michael F. Flanagan, filed. (Brookner, Jason)
September 20, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by London England on behalf of Michael F. Flanagan, filed. (England, London)
September 20, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason S. Brookner on behalf of Michael F. Flanagan, filed. (Brookner, Jason)
September 9, 2021 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Bond by Michael F. Flanagan, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Brookner, Jason)
September 3, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE Filing of Declaration of Receiver by Michael F. Flanagan, filed. (Brookner, Jason)
September 3, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason S. Brookner; London England on behalf of Michael F. Flanagan, filed. (Brookner, Jason)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AGREED ORDER appointing Receiver (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy) Parties notified.(bwhite, 4)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Emergency; granting #3 Motion to Appoint.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy) Parties notified.(bwhite, 4)
September 1, 2021 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT to #3 Agreed EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION for Appointment of Receiver by Fannie Mae, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Aurzada, Keith)
September 1, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Huntington Creek Capital IV, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
August 31, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Fannie Mae, filed.(Krystinik, Jay)
August 30, 2021 Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons as to HUNTINGTON CREEK CAPITAL IV, LLC, filed.(Aurzada, Keith)
August 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Referral of Motion to Magistrate Judge Frances H. Stacy re #3 Agreed EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION for Appointment of Receiver, filed. (rhawkins)
August 30, 2021 Filing 3 Agreed EMERGENCY MOTION, MOTION for Appointment of Receiver( Motion Docket Date 9/20/2021.) by Fannie Mae, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Agreed Order)(Aurzada, Keith)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/5/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(hlermaadi, 4)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HUNTINGTON CREEK CAPITAL IV, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26961215) filed by Fannie Mae. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Aurzada, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fannie Mae v. Huntington Creek Capital IV, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fannie Mae
Represented By: Keith Miles Aurzada
Represented By: Jay L Krystinik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUNTINGTON CREEK CAPITAL IV, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?