Yates v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Leandrea Olawepo Yates
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 4:2021cv02841
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Nancy A. Berryhill served on 10/4/2021, answer due 12/3/2021, filed.(Dewberry, Donald)
October 11, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Nancy A. Berryhill served on 9/29/2021, answer due 11/29/2021, filed.(Dewberry, Donald)
October 11, 2021 Filing 4 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Nancy A. Berryhill served on 9/27/2021, answer due 11/26/2021, filed.(Dewberry, Donald)
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(hcarr, 4)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Social Security Administration (Notice Only), filed.(Dewberry, Donald)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill (Amended Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis granted by Judge Alfred H Bennett on 08/25/2021) filed by Leandrea Olawepo Yates.(ltien, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yates v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leandrea Olawepo Yates
Represented By: Donald Clifton Dewberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?