G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. 8102 Irvington, LLC et al
Plaintiff: G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC
Defendant: 8102 Irvington, LLC doing business as El Rinconcito Lounge doing business as El Rinconsito Cantina, Paul L. Davidson doing business as El Rinconcito Lounge doing business as El Rinconsito Cantina, 8102 Irvington, LLC individually and doing business as El Rinconcito Lounge doing business as El Rinconsito Cantina and Paul L. Davidson individually and doing business as El Rinconcito Lounge doing business as El Rinconsito Cantina
Case Number: 4:2021cv03058
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference set for 11/23/2021 at 10:15 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray, filed. (jmarchand, 4)
September 23, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to 8102 Irvington, LLC and Paul L. Davidson. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BrandisIsom, 4)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/23/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(lgouadi, 4)
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 (for Paul Davidson))(Diaz, David)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC, filed.(Diaz, David)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27071486) filed by G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC.(Diaz, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. 8102 Irvington, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC
Represented By: David M. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 8102 Irvington, LLC doing business as El Rinconcito Lounge doing business as El Rinconsito Cantina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul L. Davidson doing business as El Rinconcito Lounge doing business as El Rinconsito Cantina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 8102 Irvington, LLC individually and doing business as El Rinconcito Lounge doing business as El Rinconsito Cantina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul L. Davidson individually and doing business as El Rinconcito Lounge doing business as El Rinconsito Cantina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?