Hutchings et al v. Barnes & Noble Booksellers, Inc.
Plaintiff: JUDE HUTCHINGS and KAI HUTCHINGS
Defendant: BARNES & NOBLE BOOKSELLERS, INC.
Case Number: 4:2021cv03076
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Peter Bray
Referring Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for Barnes & Noble Booksellers, Inc. 12/6/2021.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4)
November 8, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiffs' ComplaintMotions referred to Peter Bray. by Barnes & Noble Booksellers, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Second Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint)(Gaige, Juliana)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for Barnes & Noble Booksellers, Inc. 11/15/2021.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4)
October 13, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiffs' ComplaintMotions referred to Peter Bray. by Barnes & Noble Booksellers, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint)(Gaige, Juliana)
October 4, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Barnes & Noble Booksellers, Inc. served on 9/24/2021, answer due 10/15/2021, filed.(Rosenberg, Gregg)
September 29, 2021 Filing 8 General Reference to Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. The initial conference set for 12/27/2021 before Judge Lynn N. Hughes is cancelled. (ghassan, 4)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Thomas N. Hutchings to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
September 23, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Barnes & Noble Booksellers, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 12/27/2021 at 11:00 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(lgouadi, 4)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 Other EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by JUDE HUTCHINGS, KAI HUTCHINGS, filed.(Rosenberg, Gregg)
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for THOMAS N. HUTCHINGS to Appear Pro Hac Vice by JUDE HUTCHINGS, KAI HUTCHINGS, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/12/2021. (Rosenberg, Gregg)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to BARNES & NOBLE BOOKSELLERS, INC., filed.(Rosenberg, Gregg)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BARNES & NOBLE BOOKSELLERS, INC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27077974) filed by KAI HUTCHINGS, JUDE HUTCHINGS.(Rosenberg, Gregg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutchings et al v. Barnes & Noble Booksellers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDE HUTCHINGS
Represented By: Gregg M Rosenberg
Represented By: Thomas N. Hutchings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAI HUTCHINGS
Represented By: Gregg M Rosenberg
Represented By: Thomas N. Hutchings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARNES & NOBLE BOOKSELLERS, INC.
Represented By: Juliana Connolly Gaige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?