Taya Agricultural Feed Mill Co. v. Heritier Byishimo, et al
Defendant: Taya Agricultural Feed Mill Co., Heritier Byishimo, Alaxco International and JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2021cv03088
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tomsen, Jennifer)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING CHASE'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT #8 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Chase to answer or move in response to Plaintiff's Original Complaint (Docket Entry No. #1 is extended to November 12, 2021. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified. (ClaudiaGutierrez, 4)
October 26, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tomsen, Jennifer)
October 11, 2021 Filing 7 Proof of Service for JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A. by Taya Agricultural Feed Mill Co., filed.(Blakley, John)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Xavier M. Bailliard to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
October 7, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Alaxco International, Heritier Byishimo, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation, #2 Continuation)(BrandisIsom, 4)
October 6, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Xavier M. Bailliard to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Taya Agricultural Feed Mill Co., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/27/2021. (Blakley, John)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Taya Agricultural Feed Mill Co., filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation Additional Summons - Byishimo, #2 Continuation Additional Summons - Chase Bank)(Blakley, John)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 12/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(BrandisIsom, 4)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Taya Agricultural Feed Mill Co. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27085833) filed by Taya Agricultural Feed Mill Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Sales Contract for Distiller Dried Grains Letter, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Proforma Invoice, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Certificate of Commercial Registration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - JPMorgan Chase letter, Declaration and Signature Card)(Blakley, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taya Agricultural Feed Mill Co. v. Heritier Byishimo, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taya Agricultural Feed Mill Co.
Represented By: John David Blakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heritier Byishimo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaxco International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jennifer Tomsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?