Ford v. Conoco Phillips Company
Plaintiff: Shawn Michael Ford
Defendant: Conocco Phillips Company and ConocoPhillips
Intervenor Defendant: Bedrock Petroleum Consultants, LLC and Bedrock PC 1099, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv03099
Filed: September 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Charles Eskridge
Referring Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER on Withdrawal. Taylor Shelton Montgomery is fully withdrawn as counsel for Ford #63 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
November 8, 2022 Filing 63 MOTION for Taylor S. Montgomery to Withdraw as Attorney by Shawn Michael Ford, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Josephson, Michael)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER TO REPORT. As stipulated, the parties may confer regarding class action certification. By December 2, 2022, the parties must update this Court on whether an agreement has been reached regarding class action certification. If an agreement has not been reached, the parties may request a briefing schedule (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
October 28, 2022 Filing 61 STATUS REPORT by Bedrock PC 1099, LLC, Bedrock Petroleum Consultants, LLC, filed.(Grant, Ashlee)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER to Report. By 10/28/2022, the parties must jointly report as ordered. Internal review set for 10/31/2022. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
August 27, 2022 Filing 59 STATUS REPORT by Shawn Michael Ford, filed.(Burch, Richard)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER to Report. By 8/26/2022, the parties must jointly report as ordered. Internal review set for 8/29/2022. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Denying Stay. The motion to stay pending appeal is denied #48 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
August 3, 2022 Filing 56 REPLY in Support of #48 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal, filed by Bedrock PC 1099, LLC, Bedrock Petroleum Consultants, LLC, ConocoPhillips. (Clark, Shauna)
July 27, 2022 Filing 55 RESPONSE in Opposition to #48 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal, filed by Shawn Michael Ford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hinkle EN Banc Denial)(Montgomery, Taylor)
July 26, 2022 Filing 54 Minute Entry for PRETRIAL CONFERENCEd held before Judge Lynn N Hughes held on 7/26/2022. The motion to stay taken under advisement. Appearances: Richard Burch, Kimberly Cheeseman, Ashlee Grant, Lisa Parker. (Court Reporter: N. Forrest) (ghassan, 4)
July 22, 2022 Electronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided re: #47 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, #46 Notice of Appeal to David Michael Mathews and Richard J. Burch. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 22-20334), filed.(DorinaReyna, 1)
July 20, 2022 Electronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided re: #47 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, #46 Notice of Appeal to Attorney: Soloway, Joy Michele. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 22-20334), filed.(EdnitaPonce, 1)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Order Resetting Conference. Pretrial Conference reset for 7/26/2022 at 02:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
July 19, 2022 Electronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided re: #47 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, #46 Notice of Appeal to Grant, Ashlee Cassman. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 22-20334), filed.(mperez, 1)
July 15, 2022 Electronic record on appeal certified to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals re: #47 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, #46 Notice of Appeal USCA No. 22-20334, filed.(mperez, 1)
July 15, 2022 Notice of Assignment of USCA No. 22-20334 re: #47 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, #46 Notice of Appeal, filed.(mperez, 1)
July 15, 2022 *** EROA access not granted; Notice of Appearance not filed. (mperez, 1)
July 13, 2022 Filing 52 DKT13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST by Intervenors Bedrock Petroleum Consultants, LLC and Bedrock PC 1099, LLC. Transcript is unnecessary for appeal purposes This order form relates to the following: #47 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, #46 Notice of Appeal, filed.(Grant, Ashlee)
July 13, 2022 Filing 51 DKT13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST by ConocoPhillips Company. Transcript is unnecessary for appeal purposes This order form relates to the following: #47 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, #46 Notice of Appeal, filed. (Clark, Shauna)
July 8, 2022 Filing 50 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: #46 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Paid, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal) (mperez, 1)
July 8, 2022 Filing 49 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: #47 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. Fee status: Paid, filed. (Attachments: #1 Interlocutory NOA) (mperez, 1)
July 8, 2022 Appeal Review Notes re: #47 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. Fee status: Paid. The appeal filing fee has been paid or an ifp motion has been granted.Hearings were held in the case - transcripts were produced. Number of DKT-13 Forms expected: 1, filed.(mperez, 1)
July 8, 2022 Appeal Review Notes re: #46 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Paid. The appeal filing fee has been paid or an ifp motion has been granted.Hearings were held in the case - transcripts were produced. Number of DKT-13 Forms expected: 1, filed.(mperez, 1)
July 7, 2022 Filing 48 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal by Bedrock PC 1099, LLC, Bedrock Petroleum Consultants, LLC, ConocoPhillips, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Clark, Shauna)
July 7, 2022 Filing 47 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: #40 Order by Bedrock PC 1099, LLC, Bedrock Petroleum Consultants, LLC (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ATXSDC-28428167), filed.(Grant, Ashlee)
July 7, 2022 Filing 46 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: #40 Order by ConocoPhillips (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number BTXSDC-28428176), filed. (Clark, Shauna)
June 28, 2022 Filing 45 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #44 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (ShannonHolden, 4)
June 28, 2022 Filing 44 TRANSCRIPT re: Initial Conference held on 3/8/22 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. Court Reporter/Transcriber Heather Alcaraz. Ordering Party Richard Burch Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2022., filed. (Alcaraz, Heather)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Order: Pretrial Conference set for 7/25/2022 at 11:00 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
June 24, 2022 Filing 42 STATUS REPORT by ConocoPhillips, filed.(Clark, Shauna)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER to Report. By 6/24/2022, the parties must jointly report the status of this case as ordered. Internal review set for 6/27/2022. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Denying Arbitration terminating #24 , #26 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
June 3, 2022 Filing 39 REPLY in Support of #26 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff's Claims and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Litigation, filed by ConocoPhillips. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Clark, Shana)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Extension ORDER. By 6/3/2022, Conoco Phillips may reply to Ford's response to its motion to compel arbitration #37 . Internal review set for 6/6/2022. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
May 27, 2022 Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Plaintiff's Response by ConocoPhillips, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Clark, Shana)
May 20, 2022 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition to #26 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff's Claims and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Litigation, filed by Shawn Michael Ford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Ford declaration)(Schreiber, Richard)
May 19, 2022 Filing 35 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Richard J. (Rex) Burch for Transcript of Initial Conference on 03/08/2022 before Judge Hughes. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Heather Alcaraz, filed. (Burch, Richard)
May 13, 2022 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to #24 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, filed by Bedrock PC 1099, LLC, Bedrock Petroleum Consultants, LLC. (Grant, Ashlee)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Extension ORDER terminating #32 . By 5/20/2022, Ford may respond to ConocoPhillips's motion to compel arbitration. By 5/27/2022, ConocoPhillips may reply. Internal review set for 5/30/2022. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
May 10, 2022 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration by Shawn Michael Ford, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schreiber, Richard)
May 10, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor S. Montgomery on behalf of Shawn Michael Ford, filed. (Montgomery, Taylor)
May 6, 2022 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition to #25 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, filed by Shawn Michael Ford. (Schreiber, Richard)
April 29, 2022 Filing 29 STATUS REPORT by Shawn Michael Ford, filed.(Burch, Richard)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Extension Order. By May 6, 2022, Shawn Michael Ford may respond to Bedrock's motion to Compel arbitration (27). By May 13, 2022, Bedrock may reply. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
April 28, 2022 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time respond to the Bedrock Intervenors Motion to Compel Arbitration by Shawn Michael Ford, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burch, Richard)
April 22, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff's Claims and to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay Litigation by ConocoPhillips, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit B-1, #5 Proposed Order)(Clark, Shana)
April 8, 2022 Filing 25 THIS IS A DUPLICATE ENTRY OF DOCUMENT NO. #24 (Per Attorney) MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Bedrock PC 1099, LLC, Bedrock Petroleum Consultants, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Grant, Ashlee) Modified on 4/11/2022 (BrendaLacy, 4).
April 8, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Bedrock PC 1099, LLC, Bedrock Petroleum Consultants, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grant, Ashlee)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER to Report. By 4/29/2022, the parties must jointly report the status of this case as ordered. Internal review set for 5/2/2022. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Allowing Intervention. Bedrock Petroleum Consultants and Bedrock PC 1099 may intervene #15 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
April 1, 2022 Filing 21 REPLY in Support of #15 MOTION to Intervene, filed by Bedrock PC 1099, LLC, Bedrock Petroleum Consultants, LLC. (Grant, Ashlee)
March 25, 2022 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition to #15 MOTION to Intervene, filed by Shawn Michael Ford. (Schreiber, Richard)
March 8, 2022 Filing 19 Minute Entry for INTIAL CONFERENCE held before Judge Lynn N Hughes on 3/8/2022. Appearances: Richard Burch, Kimberly Cheeseman, Ashlee Grant, Lisa Virgen. (Court Reporter: H. Alcaraz) (ghassan, 4)
March 7, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. (Rex) Burch on behalf of Shawn Michael Ford, filed. (Burch, Richard)
March 7, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Glen Shu on behalf of Bedrock PC 1099, LLC, Bedrock Petroleum Consultants, LLC, filed. (Shu, Pengcheng)
March 7, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa L. Virgen on behalf of Bedrock PC 1099, LLC, Bedrock Petroleum Consultants, LLC, filed. (Virgen, Lisa)
March 4, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Intervene by Bedrock Petroleum Consultants, LLC, Bedrock PC 1099, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Lowri Thomas, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration, #5 Proposed Order)(Grant, Ashlee)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order: Initial Conference set for 3/8/2022 at 10:30 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Charles Eskridge recused. Case reassigned to Judge Lynn N Hughes for all further proceedings.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ENTRY and ORDER: Minute entry for proceedings before Judge Charles Eskridge on December 17, 2021. INITIAL CONFERENCE. All parties present by videoconference and represented by counsel. The Court addressed the scheduling and docket control order and the parties' joint discovery/case management plan. Dkts 6 & 10. The parties advised of the potential existence of a binding arbitration agreement between the parties. Appearances: Rick Schreiber f/ Plaintiff; Kimberly Cheeseman f/ Defendant. Ct Reporter: ERO. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
December 16, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Cheeseman on behalf of ConocoPhillips, filed. (Cheeseman, Kimberly)
December 16, 2021 ***Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 12/17/2021 at 02:30 PM by video before Judge Charles Eskridge. (jengonzalez, 4)
December 16, 2021 Initial Conference set for 12/16/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8B before Judge Charles Eskridge is CANCELED and will be reset. (jengonzalez, 4)
December 2, 2021 Filing 10 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by ConocoPhillips, filed.(Clark, Shana)
December 2, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by ConocoPhillips, filed.(Clark, Shana)
October 20, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ConocoPhillips, filed.(Clark, Shana)
October 18, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Shawn Michael Ford, filed.(Schreiber, Richard)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 02/18/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 01/19/2022. Plaintiff Expert Report due by 08/17/2022. Deft Expert Report due by 09/16/2022. Discovery due by 10/31/2022. Mediation due by 01/18/2023. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 11/30/2022. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 11/30/2022. Joint Pretrial Order due by 02/17/2023. Docket Call set for 03/20/2023 at 9:30 AM before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (jengonzalezadi) (Entered: 10/06/2021)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/16/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8B before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Conocco Phillips Company served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021, filed.(Josephson, Michael)
September 24, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Conocco Phillips Company. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(BrandisIsom, 4)
September 23, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Conocco Phillips Company, filed.(Josephson, Michael)
September 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Conocco Phillips Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27093064) filed by Shawn Michael Ford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Josephson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. Conoco Phillips Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Michael Ford
Represented By: Michael A Josephson
Represented By: Richard J Burch
Represented By: Richard Mark Schreiber
Represented By: Taylor Shelton Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conocco Phillips Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips
Represented By: Shana Johnson Clark
Represented By: Kimberly Frances Cheeseman
Represented By: Shauna Johnson Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Bedrock Petroleum Consultants, LLC
Represented By: Ashlee Cassman Grant
Represented By: Lisa Luz Virgen
Represented By: Pengcheng Glen Shu
Represented By: Lisa Luz Virgen Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Bedrock PC 1099, LLC
Represented By: Ashlee Cassman Grant
Represented By: Lisa Luz Virgen
Represented By: Pengcheng Glen Shu
Represented By: Lisa Luz Virgen Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?