Shapiro v. Domain Culinary Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Ronald Shapiro
Defendant: Domain Culinary Group, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv03139
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with N by Domain Culinary Group, LLC, filed.(De Santos, Laura)
October 13, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Domain Culinary Group, LLC served on 10/11/2021, answer due 11/1/2021, filed.(RachelSalazar, 4)
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Domain Culinary Group, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(RachelWillborg, 4)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/21/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(RachelWillborgadi, 4)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Domain Culinary Group, LLC, filed.(Vandenberg-Rodes, Dorian)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Domain Culinary Group, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27107522) filed by Ronald Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vandenberg-Rodes, Dorian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shapiro v. Domain Culinary Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Shapiro
Represented By: Dorian Vandenberg-Rodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domain Culinary Group, LLC
Represented By: Laura E. De Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?