Morlock, LLC v. Petteway et al
Plaintiff: Morlock, LLC a Texas Limited Liability Company and Morlock, LLC
Defendant: Reginald Petteway, THE BANK OF NEW YORK-MELLON, FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS OF THE CWABS, INC., ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATE SERIES 2006-08, The Bank of New York-Mellon and The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificate Holders of the CWABS, INC., Asset-backed Certificate Series
Case Number: 4:2021cv03202
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Remand filed by The Bank of New York-Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Abreo, Damian)
November 8, 2021 Filing 6 Minute Entry for INITIAL CONFERENCE held before Judge Lynn N Hughes on 11/8/2021. Remand motion taken under advisement. Order to be entered. Appearances: Jerry Schutza, Damian Abreo. (Court Reporter: H. Alcaraz) (ghassan, 4)
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by Morlock, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/22/2021. (Schutza, Jerry)
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate of Service by The Bank of New York-Mellon, filed.(Abreo, Damian)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order: Initial Conference set for 11/8/2021 at 03:00 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(RachelWillborgadi, 4)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County District Court, case number 2021-46028 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27133209) filed by THE BANK OF NEW YORK-MELLON, FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS OF THE CWABS, INC., ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATE SERIES 2006-08. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Errata, #3 Errata, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Errata, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Abreo, Damian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morlock, LLC v. Petteway et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morlock, LLC a Texas Limited Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morlock, LLC
Represented By: Jerry L. Schutza
Represented By: Jerry L Schutza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reginald Petteway
Represented By: Damian W. Abreo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BANK OF NEW YORK-MELLON, FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS OF THE CWABS, INC., ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATE SERIES 2006-08
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York-Mellon
Represented By: Damian W. Abreo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificate Holders of the CWABS, INC., Asset-backed Certificate Series
Represented By: Damian W. Abreo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?