Garcia v. Anson Partnership Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Erik Garcia
Defendant: Anson Partnership Group, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv03427
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement by Erik Garcia, filed. (Schapiro, Douglas)
December 7, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Anson Partnership Group, LLC served on 12/3/2021, answer due 12/27/2021, filed.(Schapiro, Douglas)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/28/2022 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(BrandisIsom, 4)
October 19, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Anson Partnership Group, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(RachelSalazar, 4)
October 18, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Erik Garcia, filed.(Schapiro, Douglas)
October 18, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Anson Partnership Group, LLC, filed.(Schapiro, Douglas)
October 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anson Partnership Group, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27211923) filed by Erik Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Receipt, #2 Exhibit Selfie, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schapiro, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Anson Partnership Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Garcia
Represented By: Douglas Steven Schapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anson Partnership Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?