Curtis v. RTL Foods, LLC
Plaintiff: Howard Curtis
Defendant: RTL Foods, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv03656
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by RTL Foods, LLC, filed.(Wallis, Michael)
November 24, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Howard Curtis, filed.(Sanford, Joshua)
November 12, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to RTL Foods, LLC served on 11/11/2021, answer due 12/2/2021, filed.(Sanford, Joshua)
November 11, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT to Join a Collective/Class Action for George Belmares by Howard Curtis, filed.(Sanford, Joshua)
November 9, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to RTL Foods, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(BrandisIsom, 4)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/18/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(RachelSalazaradi, 4)
November 8, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to RTL Foods, LLC, filed.(Sanford, Joshua)
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RTL Foods, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27311640) filed by Howard Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Consent to Join--Curtis Howard)(Sanford, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis v. RTL Foods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Curtis
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RTL Foods, LLC
Represented By: Michael Hamilton Wallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?