Chavera et al v. Pioneer Exploration LLC et al
Plaintiff: Enrique Chavera and Mauro Perez, Jr
Defendant: Pioneer Exploration LLC, Atlas Operating LLC and Younas Chaudhary
Case Number: 4:2021cv03712
Filed: November 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(rkonieczny, 4)
January 6, 2022 Filing 14 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Atlas Operating LLC, Younas Chaudhary, Pioneer Exploration LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation, #2 Continuation)(Moore, Melissa)
December 14, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Enrique Chavera, filed.(Moore, Melissa)
December 14, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT to Join a Collective/Class Action for Charles Avelar by Enrique Chavera, filed.(Moore, Melissa)
November 17, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT to Join a Collective/Class Action for Rolando R. Diaz by Enrique Chavera, filed.(Moore, Melissa)
November 17, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT to Join a Collective/Class Action for Noe M. Guzman by Enrique Chavera, filed.(Moore, Melissa)
November 17, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT to Join a Collective/Class Action for Enrique Oliveira by Enrique Chavera, filed.(Moore, Melissa)
November 17, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT to Join a Collective/Class Action for Marcos Adrian by Enrique Chavera, filed.(Moore, Melissa)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/4/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(RachelSalazaradi, 4)
November 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Aimara Flores on behalf of Enrique Chavera, Mauro Perez, Jr, filed. (Flores, Aimara)
November 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Curt Hesse on behalf of Enrique Chavera, Mauro Perez, Jr, filed. (Hesse, Curt)
November 11, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Moore on behalf of Enrique Chavera, Mauro Perez, Jr, filed. (Moore, Melissa)
November 11, 2021 Filing 3 CONSENT to Join a Collective/Class Action by Mauro Perez, Jr, filed.(Moore, Melissa)
November 11, 2021 Filing 2 CONSENT to Join a Collective/Class Action by Enrique Chavera, filed.(Moore, Melissa)
November 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Atlas Operating LLC, Younas Chaudhary, Pioneer Exploration LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27332179) filed by Enrique Chavera, Mauro Perez, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moore, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chavera et al v. Pioneer Exploration LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Chavera
Represented By: Aimara Flores
Represented By: Curt Christopher Hesse
Represented By: Melissa Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mauro Perez, Jr
Represented By: Aimara Flores
Represented By: Curt Christopher Hesse
Represented By: Melissa Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Exploration LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlas Operating LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Younas Chaudhary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?