Stinson et al v. Nine Energy Service, LLC
Plaintiff: Justin Stinson, Kenneth Sloan and Thomas Dundas
Defendant: Nine Energy Service, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv03727
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Nine Energy Service, LLC served on 12/3/2021, answer due 2/1/2022, filed.(Cowan, Robert)
November 22, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to All Defendants, filed.(Cowan, Robert)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for FLSA.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 2/25/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(RachelSalazaradi, 4)
November 15, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Nine Energy Service, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ShannonHolden, 4)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Nine Energy Service, LLC, filed.(Cowan, Robert)
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nine Energy Service, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27337722) filed by Justin Stinson, Thomas Dundas, Kenneth Sloan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Consent, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Consent, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cowan, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stinson et al v. Nine Energy Service, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Stinson
Represented By: Robert W Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Sloan
Represented By: Robert W Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Dundas
Represented By: Robert W Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nine Energy Service, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?