Anderson et al v. Harris County, Texas et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth D. Anderson, Kristen Sandoval, Estate of Kenneth Anderson, Jr. and Kristen Sandoval a/n/f of N.B.A. and N.K.A.
Defendant: Harris County, Texas, Harris County Sheriff's Office, Crystal Estrada, Individual Officers 1-10, Individual Employees 1-10, Mohanad Alobaidi, Victor Page and Mercy Garcia
Petitioner: Kenneth Anderson, Sr.
Case Number: 4:2021cv03730
Filed: November 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2022 Filing 43 MOTION to Intervene by Evelyn Woods, Kenneth Anderson, Sr., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Intervenor Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order granting intervention)(Scofield, Jason)
January 10, 2022 Filing 42 REPLY in Support of #26 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, , filed by Crystal Estrada. (Butt, James)
January 10, 2022 Filing 41 REPLY in Support of #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Harris County, Texas. (Callan, Jennifer)
January 7, 2022 Filing 40 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Victor Page served on 1/4/2022, answer due 1/25/2022, filed.(Edwards, George)
January 7, 2022 Filing 39 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Crystal Estrada served on 1/6/2022, answer due 1/27/2022, filed.(Edwards, George)
January 5, 2022 Filing 38 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT against Mohanad Alobaidi, Crystal Estrada, Mercy Garcia, Harris County Sheriff's Office, Harris County, Texas, Victor Page filed by Anthony Malley, Evelyn Woods, Jason Scofield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Custodial Death Report, #2 Exhibit Taser Guidelines, #3 Exhibit News story about HCSD taser abuse)(Scofield, Jason)
January 4, 2022 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition to #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Kenneth D. Anderson, Estate of Kenneth Anderson, Jr., Kristen Sandoval. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Denying Motion to Dismiss - Harris County, #2 Exhibit US DOJ Civil Rights Division Investigation, #3 Exhibit Office of Inspector General Report)(Edwards, George)
January 4, 2022 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition to #26 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, , filed by Kenneth D. Anderson, Estate of Kenneth Anderson, Jr., Kristen Sandoval. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Denying Motion to Dismiss - Estrada)(Edwards, George)
January 3, 2022 Filing 35 Summons Issued as to Mohanad Alobaidi, Crystal Estrada, Mercy Garcia, Victor Page. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation, #2 Continuation, #3 Continuation)(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying #12 Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery.Any other discovery matters will be taken up at the scheduling conference on February 25, 2022.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
December 21, 2021 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION to Correct by Kenneth D. Anderson, Estate of Kenneth Anderson, Jr., Kristen Sandoval, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Herron, Christine)
December 20, 2021 Filing 32 Amended CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kenneth D. Anderson, Estate of Kenneth Anderson, Jr., Kristen Sandoval, filed.(Edwards, George)
December 20, 2021 Filing 31 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Mohanad Alobaidi, Crystal Estrada, Mercy Garcia, Victor Page, filed. (Attachments: #1 Request for Issuance - Page, #2 Request for Issuance - Alobaidi, #3 Request for Issuance - Garcia)(Edwards, George)
December 19, 2021 Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Estate of Kenneth Anderson, Jr., Kristen Sandoval, Kenneth D. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Custodial Death Report - Anderson)(Edwards, George)
December 17, 2021 Filing 29 REPLY in Support of #23 MOTION to Stay , filed by Crystal Estrada, Harris County, Texas. (Butt, James)
December 16, 2021 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to #12 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Discovery to Texas Commission on Jail Standards, filed by Kenneth D. Anderson, Estate of Kenneth Anderson, Jr., Kristen Sandoval. (Herron, Christine)
December 15, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Harris County, Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Callan, Jennifer)
December 15, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Crystal Estrada, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Butt, James)
December 13, 2021 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition to #23 MOTION to Stay , filed by Kenneth D. Anderson, Estate of Kenneth Anderson, Jr., Kristen Sandoval. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Edwards, George)
December 10, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of service of disclosures by Harris County, Texas, filed. (Callan, Jennifer)
December 9, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Stay by Crystal Estrada, Harris County, Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Butt, James)
December 9, 2021 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition to #12 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Discovery to Texas Commission on Jail Standards, filed by Crystal Estrada, Harris County, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Butt, James)
December 7, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by James Butt on behalf of Crystal Estrada, filed. (Butt, James)
December 7, 2021 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Crystal Estrada, Harris County, Texas, filed.(Callan, Jennifer)
December 7, 2021 Filing 19 STIPULATION re: Extension of Answer and Response Dates by Harris County, Texas, filed.(Callan, Jennifer)
November 30, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kenneth D. Anderson, Estate of Kenneth Anderson, Jr., Kristen Sandoval, filed.(Edwards, George)
November 22, 2021 Filing 17 RETURN of Service on Harris County Employees 1-10 served on 11/18/2021 filed.(thanniable, 4)
November 22, 2021 Filing 16 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Harris County, Texas served on 11/18/2021, answer due 12/9/2021, filed.(thanniable, 4)
November 22, 2021 Filing 15 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Harris County Sheriff's Office served on 11/18/2021, answer due 12/9/2021, filed.(thanniable, 4)
November 22, 2021 Filing 14 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Individual Employees 1-10 served on 11/18/2021, answer due 12/9/2021, filed.(thanniable, 4)
November 22, 2021 Filing 13 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Crystal Estrada served on 11/18/2021, answer due 12/9/2021, filed.(thanniable, 4)
November 22, 2021 Filing 12 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Discovery to Texas Commission on Jail Standards by Kenneth D. Anderson, Estate of Kenneth Anderson, Jr., Kristen Sandoval, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter from HC to TOAG, #2 Exhibit PIA Request to HCA, #3 Exhibit PIA Request to Joint Processing Center, #4 Exhibit PIA Response from HCA, #5 Exhibit ORD No. 362, #6 Exhibit Mental Health Chart, #7 Exhibit Instructions on Suicide and Mental Impairment, #8 Exhibit Texas Administrative Code, #9 Exhibit Correspondence bt Ps Counsel and HC Counsel, #10 Exhibit Correspondence bt Ps Counsel and HC Counsel - 11.22.2021, #11 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Edwards, George)
November 22, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Eman Patricia Arabi Katbi on behalf of Kenneth D. Anderson, Estate of Kenneth Anderson, Jr., Kristen Sandoval, filed. (Katbi, Eman)
November 18, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Harris County Sheriff's Office. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(RachelSalazar, 4)
November 18, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Crystal Estrada, Harris County, Texas, Individual Employees 1-10, Individual Officers 1-10. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(RachelSalazar, 4)
November 17, 2021 Filing 8 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Individual Employees 1-10, filed.(Edwards, George)
November 17, 2021 Filing 7 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Individual Officers 1-10, filed.(Edwards, George)
November 17, 2021 Filing 6 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Crystal Estrada, filed.(Edwards, George)
November 17, 2021 Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Harris County Sheriff's Office, filed.(Edwards, George)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Harris County, Texas, filed.(Edwards, George)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/25/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(RachelSalazaradi, 4)
November 16, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine D. Herron on behalf of Kenneth D. Anderson, Estate of Kenneth Anderson, Jr., Kristen Sandoval a/n/f of N.B.A. and N.K.A., Kristen Sandoval, filed. (Herron, Christine)
November 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27338512) filed by Estate of Kenneth Anderson, Jr., Kristen Sandoval a/n/f of N.B.A. and N.K.A., Kristen Sandoval, Kenneth D. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1 - CUSTODIAL DEATH REPORT)(Edwards, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson et al v. Harris County, Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth D. Anderson
Represented By: George Edwards, IIl
Represented By: Christine Diane Herron
Represented By: Eman Patricia Arabi Katbi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Sandoval
Represented By: George Edwards, IIl
Represented By: Christine Diane Herron
Represented By: Eman Patricia Arabi Katbi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Kenneth Anderson, Jr.
Represented By: George Edwards, IIl
Represented By: Christine Diane Herron
Represented By: Eman Patricia Arabi Katbi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Sandoval a/n/f of N.B.A. and N.K.A.
Represented By: George Edwards, IIl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris County, Texas
Represented By: Jennifer F Callan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Estrada
Represented By: James Carroll Butt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Individual Officers 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Individual Employees 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohanad Alobaidi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercy Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kenneth Anderson, Sr.
Represented By: Jason Patrick Scofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?