Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 70.139.135.27 and John Doe
Case Number: 4:2021cv03815
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on Motion for Leave to Serve Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(JosephWells, 4)
January 4, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. MOTION HEARING held on 1/4/2022 on the Motion for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Doc. 5). The Court GRANTED the Motion. A formal order will follow. Appearances: Forrest Mathew Seger, III.(Court Reporter: M. Malone)(Law clerk: J. Hutton), filed.(arrivera, 4)
December 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Setting as to #5 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 1/4/2022 at 02:00 PM in by telephone before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
December 23, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order)(Seger, Forrest)
November 22, 2021 Filing 4 Register of Copyrights Notified. AO-121, filed. (RachelSalazaradi, 4)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/18/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(RachelSalazaradi, 4)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, filed.(Seger, Forrest)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 70.139.135.27 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27374041) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seger, Forrest)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Forrest Mathew Seger, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 70.139.135.27
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?