Sanders et al v. The Boeing Company et al
Plaintiff: Lee Marvin Sanders and Matthew Sodrok
Defendant: The Boeing Company, Kidde Technologies Inc and Jamco America Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv04042
Filed: December 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2022 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motions by Lee Marvin Sanders, Matthew Sodrok, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/28/2022. (Davis, Joshua)
January 28, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(B)(2) and Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(B)(6) For Failure to state a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted and Brief in Support( by Kidde Technologies Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Geffrey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint as Untimely Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and Brief in Support by The Boeing Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order)(Hardin, John)
January 28, 2022 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiffs Original Petition by Kidde Technologies Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Geffrey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 15 APPENDIX re: #14 MOTION for Judgment by Jamco America Inc., filed.(Swaim, Don)
January 28, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Judgment by Jamco America Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/18/2022. (Swaim, Don)
January 28, 2022 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jamco America Inc. identifying Jamco Corporation (Japan) as Corporate Parent, filed.(Swaim, Don)
January 28, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Jamco America Inc., filed.(Swaim, Don)
January 25, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Daniel P. Ridlon to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Boeing Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/15/2022. (Hardin, John)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Laura Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
January 20, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Laura Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Boeing Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/10/2022. (Hardin, John)
January 4, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by The Boeing Company, filed.(Hardin, John)
December 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex J. Whitman on behalf of Jamco America Inc., filed. (Whitman, Alex)
December 22, 2021 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by The Boeing Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Set Deadline for Filing Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint)(Hardin, John)
December 21, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT to Removal by Kidde Technologies Inc, filed.(Anderson, Geffrey)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Jamco America Inc., filed. (Swaim, Don)
December 13, 2021 Filing 3 DECLARATION of John Hardin re: #1 Notice of Removal,,, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Envelope Exhibit C)(Hardin, John)
December 13, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Boeing Company, filed.(Hardin, John)
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 198th Harris County District Court, case number 202174036 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27461888) filed by The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Index of Documents Being Filed, #2 Exhibit A-1 Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #3 Exhibit A-2 - Letter from TXSOS, #4 Exhibit A-3 Request for Issuance of Citation, #5 Exhibit A-4 Harris County Docket Sheet, #6 Exhibit A-5 List of Counsel of Record, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hardin, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders et al v. The Boeing Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Marvin Sanders
Represented By: Joshua Paul Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Sodrok
Represented By: Joshua Paul Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Represented By: John Russell Hardin
Represented By: Laura Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde Technologies Inc
Represented By: Geffrey W Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamco America Inc.
Represented By: Alex Joseph Whitman
Represented By: Don Swaim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?