Scott v. Bellfontaine Apartments Inc
Plaintiff: Lawrence Scott
Defendant: Bellfontaine Apartments Inc
Case Number: 4:2022cv00485
Filed: February 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Case terminated on March 18, 2022 (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
March 17, 2022 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Lawrence Scott, filed.(Ku, Brian)
March 7, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Referral of Motion to Magistrate Judge Peter Bray re #8 MOTION for More Definite Statement, filed. (ealexander, 4)
March 4, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Bellfontaine Apartments Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McFarland, John)
February 18, 2022 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Bellfontaine Apartments Inc served on 2/17/2022, answer due 3/10/2022, filed.(Ku, Brian)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/12/2022 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
February 15, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Bellfontaine Apartments Inc. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
February 14, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Bellfontaine Apartments Inc, filed.(Ku, Brian)
February 14, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John K. Grubb on behalf of Lawrence Scott, filed. (Grubb, John)
February 14, 2022 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Bellfontaine Apartments Inc, filed.(Ku, Brian)
February 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bellfontaine Apartments Inc (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-27749199) filed by Lawrence Scott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ku, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Bellfontaine Apartments Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Scott
Represented By: John K Grubb
Represented By: Brian Tse-Hua Ku
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bellfontaine Apartments Inc
Represented By: John H. McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?