Teatro v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Susan Teatro
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 4:2022cv00519
Filed: February 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Life Insurance Company of North America, filed.(Wills, Linda)
April 6, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America, filed.(Wills, Linda)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (Answer due 4/11/2022 for Life Insurance Company of North America). (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
March 10, 2022 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/31/2022. (Wills, Linda)
February 25, 2022 The above entitled action is assigned to United States District Judge George C. Hanks, Jr. Attorneys and Pro Se individuals are responsible for complying with this Court's rules and procedures, specifically, under Rule 6. Motion Practice. B. Pre-Motion Conferences Required for Particular Motions. Please download and review the individual practices of the assigned District Judge, located at: https://www.txs.uscourts.gov/sites/txs/files/GCH_Court_Procedures.pdf. (Note: If clicking the link does not work, you can copy/paste the url into your web browser address bar to view the procedures.) (bthomas, 4)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/29/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(BrandisIsom, 4)
February 18, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (RachelWillborg, 4)
February 17, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Susan Teatro, filed.(Valdez, Selina)
February 17, 2022 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Life Insurance Company of North America, filed.(Valdez, Selina)
February 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-27766485) filed by Susan Teatro. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Valdez, Selina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teatro v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Teatro
Represented By: Selina Renae Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Linda P Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?