Speech First, Inc. v. Khator et al
Plaintiff: Speech First, Inc.
Defendant: Renu Khator, PAULA MYRICK SHORT, DANIEL M. MAXWELL, DONELL YOUNG, KAMRAN RIAZ, DEVON FAN, Tilman J. Fertitta, RICKY RAVEN, Beth Madison, Durga D. Agrawal, Doug H. Brooks, Alonzo Cantu, Steve I. Chazen, John A. McCall, Jack B. Moore, Daniel M Maxwell and John A McCall, Jr
Case Number: 4:2022cv00582
Filed: February 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2022 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Obligation To Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Durga D. Agrawal, Doug H. Brooks, Alonzo Cantu, Steve I. Chazen, Devon Fan, Tilman J. Fertitta, Renu Khator, Beth Madison, Daniel M Maxwell, John A McCall, Jr, Jack B. Moore, Ricky Raven, Kamran Riaz, Paula Myrick Short, Donell Young, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/13/2022. (Melton, Brian)
April 22, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Speech First, Inc., filed. (Connolly, John)
April 15, 2022 Filing 19 REPLY in Support of #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Speech First, Inc.. (Connolly, John)
April 1, 2022 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Durga D. Agrawal, Doug H. Brooks, Alonzo Cantu, Steve I. Chazen, Devon Fan, Tilman J. Fertitta, Renu Khator, Beth Madison, Daniel M Maxwell, John A McCall, Jr, Jack B. Moore, Ricky Raven, Kamran Riaz, Paula Myrick Short, Donell Young. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Susan Koch, #2 Declaration of Kamran Riaz, #3 Proposed Order)(Wilson, Daniel)
April 1, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Wilson on behalf of Durga D. Agrawal, Doug H. Brooks, Alonzo Cantu, Steve I. Chazen, Devon Fan, Tilman J. Fertitta, Renu Khator, Beth Madison, Daniel M Maxwell, John A McCall, Jr, Jack B. Moore, Ricky Raven, Kamran Riaz, Paula Myrick Short, Donell Young, filed. (Wilson, Daniel)
April 1, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D. Melton on behalf of Durga D. Agrawal, Doug H. Brooks, Alonzo Cantu, Steve I. Chazen, Devon Fan, Tilman J. Fertitta, Renu Khator, Beth Madison, Daniel M Maxwell, John A McCall, Jr, Jack B. Moore, Ricky Raven, Kamran Riaz, Paula Myrick Short, Donell Young, filed. (Melton, Brian)
March 17, 2022 Filing 15 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by James F. Hasson for Transcript of Motion Hearing on 3/2/22 before Judge Hughes. 14-Day turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Mayra Malone, filed. (Hasson, James)
March 11, 2022 Filing 14 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Kelly Wilson for Transcript of Hearing, 3/2/2022, Judge Lynn Hughes. Daily (24 hours) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Mayra Malone, filed. (BrendaLacy, 4)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Cameron T. Norris to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
March 4, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Cameron T. Norris to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Speech First, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/25/2022. (Hasson, James)
March 4, 2022 Filing 11 Amended RESPONSE to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Durga D. Agrawal, Doug H. Brooks, Alonzo Cantu, Steve I. Chazen, Devon Fan, Tilman J. Fertitta, Renu Khator, Beth Madison, Daniel M Maxwell, John A McCall, Jr, Jack B. Moore, Ricky Raven, Kamran Riaz, Paula Myrick Short, Donell Young. (Palmer, Jeffrey)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to Report. By 4/1/2022, the defendants must respond to Speech First's preliminary injunction. By 4/15/2022, Speech First must reply. Internal review set for 4/18/2022. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
March 2, 2022 Filing 9 Minute Entry for HEARING held before Judge Lynn N Hughes on 3/2/2022. Order to be entered. Appearances: J. Michael Connolly, James Hasson, Dona Cornell.(Court Reporter: M. Malone) (ghassan, 4)
March 2, 2022 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Durga D. Agrawal, Doug H. Brooks, Alonzo Cantu, Steve I. Chazen, Devon Fan, Tilman J. Fertitta, Renu Khator, Beth Madison, Daniel M Maxwell, John A McCall, Jr, Jack B. Moore, Ricky Raven, Kamran Riaz, Paula Myrick Short, Donell Young. (Palmer, Jeffrey)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for J. Michael Connolly to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
March 1, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Dona Cornell on behalf of Durga D. Agrawal, Doug H. Brooks, Alonzo Cantu, Steve I. Chazen, Devon Fan, Tilman J. Fertitta, Renu Khator, Beth Madison, Daniel M Maxwell, John A McCall, Jr, Jack B. Moore, Ricky Raven, Kamran Riaz, Paula Myrick Short, Donell Young, filed. (Palmer, Jeffrey)
March 1, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for J. Michael Connolly to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Speech First, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/22/2022. (Hasson, James)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order: Hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction set for 3/2/2022 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11C before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
February 28, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Speech First, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Affidavit Declaration of James F. Hasson, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Cherise Trump, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Student A, #5 Affidavit Declaration of Student B, #6 Affidavit Declaration of Student C, #7 Proposed Order)(Hasson, James)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 5/16/2022 at 10:30 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ltien, 4)
February 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-27786578) filed by Speech First, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hasson, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Speech First, Inc. v. Khator et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Speech First, Inc.
Represented By: James Francis Hasson
Represented By: Cameron T. Norris
Represented By: John Michael Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renu Khator
Represented By: Dona Hamilton Cornell
Represented By: Brian Douglas Melton
Represented By: Daniel Allen Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAULA MYRICK SHORT
Represented By: Dona Hamilton Cornell
Represented By: Brian Douglas Melton
Represented By: Daniel Allen Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL M. MAXWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONELL YOUNG
Represented By: Dona Hamilton Cornell
Represented By: Brian Douglas Melton
Represented By: Daniel Allen Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAMRAN RIAZ
Represented By: Dona Hamilton Cornell
Represented By: Brian Douglas Melton
Represented By: Daniel Allen Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEVON FAN
Represented By: Dona Hamilton Cornell
Represented By: Brian Douglas Melton
Represented By: Daniel Allen Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tilman J. Fertitta
Represented By: Dona Hamilton Cornell
Represented By: Brian Douglas Melton
Represented By: Daniel Allen Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICKY RAVEN
Represented By: Dona Hamilton Cornell
Represented By: Brian Douglas Melton
Represented By: Daniel Allen Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Madison
Represented By: Dona Hamilton Cornell
Represented By: Brian Douglas Melton
Represented By: Daniel Allen Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Durga D. Agrawal
Represented By: Brian Douglas Melton
Represented By: Dona Hamilton Cornell
Represented By: Daniel Allen Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug H. Brooks
Represented By: Dona Hamilton Cornell
Represented By: Brian Douglas Melton
Represented By: Daniel Allen Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alonzo Cantu
Represented By: Dona Hamilton Cornell
Represented By: Brian Douglas Melton
Represented By: Daniel Allen Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve I. Chazen
Represented By: Dona Hamilton Cornell
Represented By: Brian Douglas Melton
Represented By: Daniel Allen Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack B. Moore
Represented By: Dona Hamilton Cornell
Represented By: Brian Douglas Melton
Represented By: Daniel Allen Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel M Maxwell
Represented By: Dona Hamilton Cornell
Represented By: Brian Douglas Melton
Represented By: Daniel Allen Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A McCall, Jr
Represented By: Dona Hamilton Cornell
Represented By: Brian Douglas Melton
Represented By: Daniel Allen Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?