L. et al v. CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: P. L. and V. L.
Defendant: CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company and South Texas College of Law Healthcare Benefits Plan, The
Case Number: 4:2022cv00847
Filed: March 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2022 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Silver on behalf of South Texas College of Law Healthcare Benefits Plan, The, filed. (Silver, Steven)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/20/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 5/20/2022. Pltf Expert Witness List/Reports due by 8/5/2022. Deft Expert Witness List/Reports due by 9/2/2022. Discovery due by 10/28/2022. Pretrial Motions/Motions in Limine due by 12/2/2022. Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/3/2023...*** Docket Call set for 2/10/2023 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
April 6, 2022 Filing 43 CLERKS NOTICE OF CANCELLATION - Initial Conference set for 4/15/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sim Lake is CANCELED. Parties notified, filed. (sanderson, 4)
April 6, 2022 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company, filed.(Ng, Stephanie)
April 5, 2022 Filing 41 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company, filed.(Herring, Danielle)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER - Granting #37 Motion for Brian S. King to Appear Pro Hac Vice for P. L., V. L.(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
April 4, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie C. Ng on behalf of CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company, filed. (Ng, Stephanie)
April 1, 2022 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by P. L., V. L., filed.(King, Brian)
April 1, 2022 Filing 37 MOTION for Brian S. King to Appear Pro Hac Vice by P. L., V. L., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/22/2022. (King, Brian)
March 29, 2022 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by South Texas College of Law Healthcare Benefits Plan, The, filed.(Herring, Danielle)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER - Granting #34 Motion for Steven Silver to Appear Pro Hac Vice for The South Texas College of Law Healthcare Benefits Plan. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
March 21, 2022 Filing 34 MOTION for Steven Silver to Appear Pro Hac Vice by South Texas College of Law Healthcare Benefits Plan, The, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/11/2022. (Herring, Danielle)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/15/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake.(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
March 16, 2022 Filing 32 Case transferred in from Utah. Case Number 1:21-cv-00108; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting the parties' #30 Stipulated Motion to Change Venue. This matter is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division. Defendant's #29 Motion to Change Venue is terminated as moot. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 3/15/2022. (eat)
March 14, 2022 Filing 30 Stipulated MOTION to Change Venue filed by Plaintiffs P. L., V. L.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(King, Brian)
February 24, 2022 Filing 29 MOTION to Change Venue and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant South Texas College of Law Healthcare Benefits Plan, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - STCL Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Cigna Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Memorandum)(Thomas, Ethan)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Attorney Planning Meeting Report. The parties will submit an Attorney Planning Meeting Report and proposed Scheduling Order within fourteen (14) days of the date of the court's ruling on the Defendants' anticipated Motion to Transfer Venue if the Court denies the Motion. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 12/23/2021. (eat)
December 23, 2021 Filing 27 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Attorney Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiffs P. L., V. L.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(King, Brian)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Danielle K. Herring for South Texas College of Law Healthcare Benefits Plan, The.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utah's local rules from the court's web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 11/16/2021. (eat)
November 16, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Danielle Herring , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4166227,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant South Texas College of Law Healthcare Benefits Plan, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Robertson, Ian)
November 15, 2021 Filing 24 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint filed by South Texas College of Law Healthcare Benefits Plan, The.(Thomas, Ethan)
November 15, 2021 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant South Texas College of Law Healthcare Benefits Plan, The. (Thomas, Ethan)
November 12, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint filed by CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company.(Johnson, Tim)
November 8, 2021 Filing 21 The deadline for submission of Consent/Reassignment Forms has now been passed. One or more of the parties did not file, therefore the case is ineligible for magistrate assignment. Case randomly assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #18 Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline for Defendant to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. The deadline for Defendant South Texas College of Law Healthcare Benefits Plan to respond to the Complaint is extended to November 15, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 11/5/2021. No attached document. (eh)
November 4, 2021 Filing 19 Modification of Docket re document #18 : Error: Document should have been filed as a Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer and not a Stipulation to Extend Deadlines. Correction: Event type and motion text modified to include correct filing. NO further action is needed. (alf)
November 4, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATED MOTION STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Defendant to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint for Extension of Time to File Answer by South Texas College of Law Healthcare Benefits Plan, The. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thomas, Ethan) Modified on 11/5/2021 to correct event type and motion text (alf).
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #16 Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline for Defendant Cigna Health & Life Insurance Company to Answer the Complaint in this Matter. The deadline for Defendant Cigna Health & Life Insurance Company to respond to the Complaint is extended to November 15, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 11/4/2021. No attached document. (eh)
November 4, 2021 Filing 16 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, filed by Defendant CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Tim)
October 25, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Robertson on behalf of South Texas College of Law Healthcare Benefits Plan, The (Robertson, Ian)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #13 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Defendants to File a Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint. The deadline for Defendants to respond to the Complaint is extended to November 5, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 10/25/2021. No attached document. (eh)
October 22, 2021 Filing 13 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, filed by Defendant South Texas College of Law Healthcare Benefits Plan, The. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thomas, Ethan)
October 21, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #8 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (alf)
October 14, 2021 Filing 11 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Tim L. Johnson replacing Steven R. Reid as counsel on behalf of CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company. (Johnson, Tim)
October 7, 2021 Filing 10 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant South Texas College of Law Healthcare Benefits Plan. (alf)
October 5, 2021 Filing 9 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiffs P. L., V. L.. (alf)
October 5, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company, South Texas College of Law Healthcare Benefits Plan, The, Plaintiffs P. L., V. L.. Form due by 10/20/2021. (alf)
October 4, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan D. Thomas on behalf of South Texas College of Law Healthcare Benefits Plan, The (Thomas, Ethan)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #5 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants have until October 22, 2021 to file a response to Plaintiffs' complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 10/1/2021. No attached document. (med)
September 30, 2021 Filing 5 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, filed by Defendant CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney Steven R. Reid added to party CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company(pty:dft)(Reid, Steven)
September 21, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by P. L., V. L. as to South Texas College of Law Healthcare Benefits Plan, The Waiver sent on 8/2/2021, answer due 10/1/2021. (King, Brian)
August 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 8/7/21. (alf)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company, South Texas College of Law Healthcare Benefits Plan, The (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4070554) filed by P. L., V. L.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg (King, Brian)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Plaintiffs P. L., V. L. are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L. et al v. CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P. L.
Represented By: Brian S King
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Represented By: Samuel Martin Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V. L.
Represented By: Brian S King
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Represented By: Samuel Martin Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Tim L. Johnson
Represented By: Steven R. Reid
Represented By: Danielle K. Herring
Represented By: Stephanie C Ng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Texas College of Law Healthcare Benefits Plan, The
Represented By: Danielle K. Herring
Represented By: Ian Robertson
Represented By: Ethan D. Thomas
Represented By: Steven Joshua Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?