Mackey v. Jaff et al
Plaintiff: Kirk Mackey
Defendant: Ramazan Jaff and Chong Cha
Case Number: 4:2022cv00918
Filed: March 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/3/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
May 27, 2022 Filing 11 Agreed MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Chong Cha, Ramazan Jaff, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Haun, Ryan)
May 25, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Douglas Mena on behalf of Chong Cha, Ramazan Jaff, filed. (Haun, Ryan)
May 19, 2022 Filing 9 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Kirk Mackey, filed.(Schapiro, Douglas)
May 19, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Chong Cha, Ramazan Jaff, filed.(Haun, Ryan)
May 19, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Chong Cha, Ramazan Jaff, filed.(Haun, Ryan)
May 9, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Ramazan Jaff served on 3/22/2022, answer due 5/23/2022, filed.(Schapiro, Douglas)
March 22, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (ClaudiaGutierrez, 4)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/2/2022 at 10:45 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ShannonHolden, 4)
March 21, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kirk Mackey, filed.(Schapiro, Douglas)
March 21, 2022 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Chong Cha, Ramazan Jaff, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Schapiro, Douglas)
March 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chong Cha, Ramazan Jaff (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-27911931) filed by Kirk Mackey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Receipt, #2 Exhibit Selfie, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schapiro, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mackey v. Jaff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Mackey
Represented By: Douglas Steven Schapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramazan Jaff
Represented By: D. Douglas Mena
Represented By: Ryan Keith Haun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chong Cha
Represented By: D. Douglas Mena
Represented By: Ryan Keith Haun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?