United States of America et al v. City of Baytown, Texas
Plaintiff: United States of America and State of Texas
Defendant: City of Baytown, Texas
Intervenor Plaintiff: Bayou City Waterkeeper
Case Number: 4:2022cv01279
Filed: April 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Charles Eskridge
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1319 Clean Water Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2022 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by City of Baytown, Texas, filed.(George, William)
May 31, 2022 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Bayou City Waterkeeper, filed.(Schlemmer, Kristen)
May 20, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by State of Texas, filed.(Ledbetter, Phillip)
May 20, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United States of America, filed.(Long, Kenneth)
May 20, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America, filed.(Long, Kenneth)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 10/12/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 09/09/2022. Plaintiff Expert Report due by 04/11/2023. Deft Expert Report due by 05/11/2023. Discovery due by 06/27/2023. Mediation due by 09/12/2023. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 07/27/2023. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 07/27/2023. Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/12/2023. Docket Call set for 11/21/2023 at 9:30 AM before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (jennellegonzalez) (Entered: 05/18/2022)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/10/2022 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8B before Judge Charles Eskridge(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Kenneth Long to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
May 9, 2022 Filing 8 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT against City of Baytown, Texas filed by Bayou City Waterkeeper.(jengonzalez, 4)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Intervene.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
May 6, 2022 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT to #2 MOTION for Kenneth G. Long to Appear Pro Hac Vice by United States of America, filed.(Long, Kenneth)
May 6, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to City of Baytown, Texas served on 4/22/2022, answer due 6/27/2022, filed.(Long, Kenneth)
May 5, 2022 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to All Defendants, filed.(Schlemmer, Kristen)
April 28, 2022 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by Bayou City Waterkeeper, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Intervention complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Schlemmer, Kristen)
April 21, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Kenneth G. Long to Appear Pro Hac Vice by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/12/2022. (Long, Kenneth)
April 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rodriguez, Jimmy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. City of Baytown, Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kenneth Gordon Long
Represented By: Jimmy Anthony Rodriguez
Represented By: Jennifer Lowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Texas
Represented By: Brent Webster
Represented By: Grant Dorfman
Represented By: Kenneth Paxton
Represented By: Phillip L Ledbetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Baytown, Texas
Represented By: Debra Tsuchiyama Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Bayou City Waterkeeper
Represented By: Kristen Sara Schlemmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?