Baldwin v. North American Company For Life And Health Insurance
Plaintiff: Charmaine Baldwin
Defendant: North American Company For Life And Health Insurance
Case Number: 4:2022cv01702
Filed: May 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2022 Filing 8 STIPULATION re: extending deadline to respond to Complaint by North American Company For Life And Health Insurance, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sotak, Amanda)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Granting #6 STIPULATION re: Extending Deadline for North American to Respond to Complaint ; Answer due for North American Company For Life And Health Insurance 7/25/2022. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
June 21, 2022 Filing 6 STIPULATION re: Extending Deadline for North American to Respond to Complaint by North American Company For Life And Health Insurance, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sotak, Amanda)
May 26, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to North American Company For Life And Health Insurance. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (RachelWillborg, 4)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/21/2022 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(RachelWillborg, 4)
May 25, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Charmaine Baldwin, filed.(Donaldson, Madison)
May 25, 2022 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to North American Company For Life And Health Insurance, filed.(Donaldson, Madison)
May 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against North American Company For Life And Health Insurance (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-28228575) filed by Charmaine Baldwin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Donaldson, Madison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baldwin v. North American Company For Life And Health Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charmaine Baldwin
Represented By: Madison Tate Donaldson
Represented By: Britney Anne Heath McDonald
Represented By: John Anthony Vessel
Represented By: Marc Stanley Whitehead
Represented By: Selina Renae Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Company For Life And Health Insurance
Represented By: Amanda Sotak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?