Khan v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ghous Khan
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2022cv02071
Filed: June 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
July 7, 2022 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company served on 6/28/2022, answer due 8/29/2022, filed.(McNamara, John)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 9/30/2022 at 10:10 AM by video before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(RachelWillborg, 4)
June 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-28373464) filed by Ghous Khan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McNamara, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khan v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ghous Khan
Represented By: John Price McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?