Hill v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Bobby Hill
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2022cv02081
Filed: June 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2022 Filing 11 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rademaekers, Iwana)
August 18, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Bobby Hill, filed.(Donaldson, Madison)
July 29, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Resetting re: #5 Order for Initial Conference - FORM,. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 9/22/2022 at 11:30 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon, filed. (JessicaVillarreal, 3)
July 26, 2022 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company identifying Lincoln National Corporation as Corporate Parent, filed.(Rademaekers, Iwana)
July 26, 2022 Filing 7 FILED IN ERROR CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company identifying Lincoln National Corporation as Corporate Parent, filed.(Rademaekers, Iwana) Modified on 7/26/2022 (gkelner, 4).
July 26, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Bobby Hill by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, filed.(Rademaekers, Iwana)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/22/2022 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 700 before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(RachelWillborg, 4)
June 28, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(AkeitaMichael, 4)
June 27, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Bobby Hill, filed.(Donaldson, Madison)
June 27, 2022 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, filed.(Donaldson, Madison)
June 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-28376444) filed by Bobby Hill. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Donaldson, Madison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Hill
Represented By: Madison Tate Donaldson
Represented By: Britney Anne Heath McDonald
Represented By: John Anthony Vessel
Represented By: Marc Stanley Whitehead
Represented By: Selina Renae Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Iwana Rademaekers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?