Leggett v. Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division) et al
Plaintiff: Korinne Mae Leggett
Defendant: Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division) and Sanderson Farms, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2022cv03259
Filed: September 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Agreed Protective ORDER terminating #6 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
November 10, 2022 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Sanderson Farms, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ashcraft, William)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Resetting Conference. Initial Conference reset for 12/1/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11C before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order: Initial Conference set for 11/7/2022 at 10:00 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
September 26, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(hcarr, 4)
September 23, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), filed.(Ashcraft, William)
September 23, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 361st Judicial District Court - Brazos County, case number 22-001980-cv-361 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-28820722) filed by Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Executed Processes in Case, #2 Exhibit 2 - Pleadings in State Court, #3 Exhibit 3 - Docket Sheet/Case Summary Sheet, #4 Exhibit 4 - Index of All Matters Being Filed, #5 Exhibit 5 - List of All Counsel of Record, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ashcraft, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leggett v. Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Korinne Mae Leggett
Represented By: Veronica Valenzuela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division)
Represented By: William O Ashcraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division)
Represented By: William O Ashcraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanderson Farms, Inc.
Represented By: William O Ashcraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?