Abrams v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Almeta Abrams
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 4:2022cv03815
Filed: November 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Charles Eskridge
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2022 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, filed.(Shardonofsky, Esteban)
December 12, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, filed.(Shardonofsky, Esteban)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 05/16/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 04/14/2023. Plaintiff Expert Report due by 11/14/2023. Deft Expert Report due by 12/14/2023. Discovery due by 01/30/2024. Mediation due by 04/16/2024. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 02/29/2024. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 02/29/2024. Joint Pretrial Order due by 05/16/2024. Docket Call set for 06/18/2024 at 1:30 PM before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (jennellegonzalez) (Entered: 12/02/2022)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/15/2023 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Charles Eskridge(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
November 3, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(RhondaMooreKonieczny, 4)
November 2, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Almeta Abrams, filed.(McDonald, Britney Anne)
November 2, 2022 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America, filed.(McDonald, Britney Anne)
November 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-29011583) filed by Almeta Abrams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McDonald, Britney Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abrams v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Almeta Abrams
Represented By: Britney Anne Heath McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Esteban Shardonofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?