Merrick & Co Engineers & Architects Inc v. Orion Engineered Carbons L L C
Plaintiff: Merrick & Co Engineers & Architects Inc doing business as Merrick & Co
Counter Claimant: Orion Engineered Carbons L L C
Counter Defendant: Merrick & Co Engineers & Architects Inc
Case Number: 4:2022cv03816
Filed: November 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Charles Eskridge
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Cowan on behalf of Merrick & Co Engineers & Architects Inc, filed. (Cowan, Michael)
December 15, 2022 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Merrick & Co Engineers & Architects Inc, filed.(Soto, Andres)
December 15, 2022 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Orion Engineered Carbons L L C, filed.(Hanslik, Christopher)
December 15, 2022 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Merrick & Co Engineers & Architects Inc, filed.(Soto, Andres)
December 15, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by GRANT GEALY; ANDRES SOTO on behalf of Merrick & Co Engineers & Architects Inc, filed. (Soto, Andres)
December 9, 2022 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Orion Engineered Carbons L L C, filed.(Hanslik, Christopher)
December 9, 2022 Filing 20 STATEMENT OF INFORMATION IN A REMOVED ACTION by Orion Engineered Carbons L L C, filed.(Hanslik, Christopher)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 04/04/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 03/03/2023. Plaintiff Expert Report due by 10/03/2023. Deft Expert Report due by 11/02/2023. Discovery due by 12/19/2023. Mediation due by 03/05/2024. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 01/18/2024. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 01/18/2024. Joint Pretrial Order due by 04/04/2024. Docket Call set for 05/21/2024 at 1:30 PM before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (jennellegonzalez) (Entered: 12/02/2022)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order in Removed Case. Statement due within ten days.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/1/2023 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Charles Eskridge(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #14 Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel. Attorneys Camille B Poche' and Frank Simo Slavich, III terminated. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (marflores, 4)
November 23, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Merrick & Co Engineers & Architects Inc by Orion Engineered Carbons L L C, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Hanslik, Christopher)
November 22, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Camille Bienvenu Poche and Frank S. Slavich, III to Withdraw as Attorney by Orion Engineered Carbons L L C, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hanslik, Christopher)
November 22, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Black and Brittany Rupple on behalf of Orion Engineered Carbons L L C, filed. (Black, Lauren)
November 22, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Chris Hanslik on behalf of Orion Engineered Carbons L L C, filed. (Hanslik, Christopher)
November 2, 2022 Filing 11 Case transferred in from Louisiana Western. Case Number 6:22-cv-05322; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 10/31/2022. (crt,Whitener, M)
October 28, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 Motion to Transfer case. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/27/2022. (crt,Whitener, M)
October 28, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #9 Motion to Transfer case. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Whitener, M)
October 27, 2022 Filing 9 JOINT MOTION to Transfer Case by Merrick & Company Engineers and Architects, Inc and Orion Engineered Carbons L L C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Poche', Camille) Modified to more accurately capture pleading on 10/28/2022 (Whitener, M).
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss Forum Non Conveniens, MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, and MOTION to Transfer Case. Responses due by 10/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 10/21/2022. (crt,Taylor, L)
October 20, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss Forum Non Conveniens and MOTION to Transfer Case with consent by Merrick & Co Engineers & Architects Inc. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Frilot, Mark) Modified docket text on 10/21/2022 (Whitener, M).
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 10/3/2022. (crt,Whitener, M)
October 3, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #3 MOTION to Dismiss Forum Non Conveniens, MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, and MOTION to Transfer Case. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,LaCombe, L)
September 30, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #3 MOTION to Dismiss Forum Non Conveniens MOTION to Transfer Case. Motions referred to Judge David C Joseph. (crt,Whitener, M)
September 30, 2022 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/30/2022. (crt,Mitchell, P)
September 30, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Forum Non Conveniens, MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, and MOTION to Transfer Case by Orion Engineered Carbons L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Memorandum / Brief, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Poche', Camille). Added MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue and added MOTION to Transfer Case on 9/30/2022 (Whitener, M).
September 23, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Orion Engineered Carbons L L C. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF document with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Attachment 1 to Document No. #1 , Notice of Removal. (crt,Mitchell, P)
September 23, 2022 CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Mitchell, P)
September 23, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Orion Engineered Carbons LLC. (aty,Poche', Camille)
September 23, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 16th JDC, St. Mary Parish, Case Number 136899 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5293374) filed by Orion Engineered Carbons LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Camille B Poche' added to party Orion Engineered Carbons LLC(pty:dft))(aty,Poche', Camille)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merrick & Co Engineers & Architects Inc v. Orion Engineered Carbons L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merrick & Co Engineers & Architects Inc doing business as Merrick & Co
Represented By: Mark Wayne Frilot
Represented By: Andres Omar Soto
Represented By: Michael L. Cowan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Orion Engineered Carbons L L C
Represented By: Camille B Poche'
Represented By: Frank Simo Slavich, III
Represented By: Christopher Paul Hanslik
Represented By: Lauren M Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Merrick & Co Engineers & Architects Inc
Represented By: Mark Wayne Frilot
Represented By: Michael L. Cowan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?