Caballero v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Michel Caballero
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2022cv04054
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time; Motion-related deadline set re: #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Responses due by 1/16/2023..(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
January 3, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company, filed.(Baker, Joshua)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Ashlee D. Riopka to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
December 22, 2022 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/12/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baker, Joshua)
December 21, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Ashlee D. Riopka to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/11/2023. (Riopka, Ashlee)
December 20, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Aetna Life Insurance Company, filed.(Baker, Joshua)
November 22, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Aetna Life Insurance Company. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ShannonHolden, 4)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/17/2023 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(AkeitaMichael, 4)
November 21, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Michel Caballero, filed.(Vessel, John)
November 21, 2022 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Aetna Life Insurance Company, filed.(Vessel, John)
November 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aetna Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-29103288) filed by Michel Caballero. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vessel, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caballero v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michel Caballero
Represented By: John Anthony Vessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Joshua Benjamin Baker
Represented By: Ashlee D Riopka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?