Demirhan v. Daum et al
Plaintiff: Emirhan Demirhan
Defendant: Robert L. Daum, Ur M. Jaddou, TED H. KIM and Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas
Interested Party: Social Security Administration-Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2023cv00178
Filed: January 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL ON NOTICE #6 . Case terminated on February 28, 2023. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
February 27, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Dismissal as to All Defendants by Emirhan Demirhan, filed. (White, Garrett)
February 13, 2023 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to All Defendants, filed.(White, Garrett)
January 19, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ShannonHolden, 4)
January 18, 2023 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Emirhan Demirhan, filed.(White, Garrett)
January 18, 2023 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(White, Garrett)
January 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-29334482) filed by Emirhan Demirhan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Biometrics Appointment Notice, #2 Exhibit Request for Expedite to Asylum Office)(White, Garrett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Demirhan v. Daum et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emirhan Demirhan
Represented By: Garrett M White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Daum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur M. Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TED H. KIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration-Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?