Alzobaidi v. United States Citizen and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Shehab Alzobaidi
Defendant: United States Citizen and Immigration Services, Attorney General Of The United States and Alamdar Hamdani
Interested Party: Social Security Administration-Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2023cv00219
Filed: January 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Christina A Bryan
Referring Judge: Charles Eskridge
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 06/27/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 05/25/2023. Plaintiff Expert Report due by 01/03/2024. Deft Expert Report due by 02/02/2024. Discovery due by 03/19/2024. Mediation due by 06/04/2024. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 04/18/2024. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 04/18/2024. Joint Pretrial Order due by 07/09/2024. Docket Call set for 08/20/2024 at 1:30 PM before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (MelissaMorgan) (Entered: 02/07/2023)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/25/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 701 before Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(MelissaMorgan, 4)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
January 25, 2023 Summons Issued as to Attorney General Of The United States, Alamdar Hamdani, United States Citizen and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff in person, filed.(ShannonHolden, 4)
January 20, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION/COMPLAINT for Writ of Mandamus (Filing fee $ 402) filed by Shehab Alzobaidi.(ckrus, 4)
January 20, 2023 Filing fee: $402 re: #1 Petition/Complaint for Writ of Mandamus, receipt number HOU113502, filed. (ckrus, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alzobaidi v. United States Citizen and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shehab Alzobaidi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizen and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General Of The United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alamdar Hamdani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration-Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?