Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. The Titus Law Firm PC
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Defendant: The Titus Law Firm PC
Case Number: 4:2023cv02510
Filed: July 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2023 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Titus Law Firm PC, filed.(Small, Caroline)
July 19, 2023 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed.(Palmer, Robert)
July 13, 2023 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to The Titus Law Firm PC served on 7/13/2023, answer due 9/11/2023, filed.(Palmer, Robert)
July 12, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The Titus Law Firm PC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(RhondaMooreKonieczny, 4)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/29/2023 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(AkeitaMichael, 4)
July 10, 2023 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to The Titus Law Firm PC, filed.(Palmer, Robert)
July 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Titus Law Firm PC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-30176742) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Palmer, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. The Titus Law Firm PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Robert J Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Titus Law Firm PC
Represented By: Caroline Newman Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?