Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., v. Elperalta Investment LLC et al
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.,
Defendant: Elperalta Investment LLC and Viralkumar Patel
Case Number: 4:2023cv02514
Filed: July 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary E. Patterson on behalf of Elperalta Investment LLC, filed. (Patterson, Gary)
August 22, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Elperalta Investment LLC, filed.(Patterson, Gary)
August 10, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Viralkumar Patel, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Sanders, Cavyn)
July 27, 2023 Filing 9 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Elperalta Investment LLC served on 7/26/2023, answer due 8/16/2023, filed.(Palmer, Robert)
July 26, 2023 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Viralkumar Patel served on 7/20/2023, answer due 8/10/2023, filed.(Palmer, Robert)
July 19, 2023 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.,, filed.(Palmer, Robert)
July 12, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Viralkumar Patel. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(RhondaMooreKonieczny, 4)
July 12, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Elperalta Investment LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(RhondaMooreKonieczny, 4)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/28/2023 at 10:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(AkeitaMichael, 4)
July 10, 2023 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Viralkumar Patel, filed.(Palmer, Robert)
July 10, 2023 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Elperalta Investment LLC, filed.(Palmer, Robert)
July 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in Interpleader against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-30179203) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.,. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Palmer, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., v. Elperalta Investment LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.,
Represented By: Robert J Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elperalta Investment LLC
Represented By: Gary Eugene Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viralkumar Patel
Represented By: Cavyn D Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?