Meredith et al v. Members Trust of the Southwest Federal Credit Union
Plaintiff: Marcia Meredith and Ros Dimere Inc.
Defendant: Members Trust of the Southwest Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 4:2023cv03180
Filed: August 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Charles Eskridge
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time; Motion-related deadline set re: #12 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Responsive pleading due by 11/10/2023.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(JennelleGonzalez, 4)
October 20, 2023 Filing 12 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Members Trust of the Southwest Federal Credit Union, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hamilton, E.R.)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 02/13/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 01/12/2024. Plaintiff Expert Report due by 08/13/2024. Deft Expert Report due by 09/12/2024. Discovery due by 10/29/2024. Mediation due by 01/17/2025. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 12/03/2024. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 12/03/2024. Joint Pretrial Order due by 02/19/2025. Docket Call set for 04/15/2025 at 1:30 PM before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (JacquelineMata) (Entered: 09/29/2023)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time; Motion-related deadline set re: #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Members Trust of the Southwest Federal Credit Union shall have up to and including 10/20/2023 to file its responsive pleading.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(JennelleGonzalez, 4)
September 26, 2023 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Marcia Meredith, Ros Dimere Inc., filed.(Simien, Stephany)
September 19, 2023 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Members Trust of the Southwest Federal Credit Union, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scheinthal, Scott)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/13/2023 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Charles Eskridge(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(JennelleGonzalez, 4)
September 1, 2023 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Members Trust of the Southwest Federal Credit Union served on 8/31/2023, answer due 9/21/2023, filed.(Simien, Stephany)
August 31, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephany M. Simien on behalf of Marcia Meredith, Ros Dimere Inc., filed. (Simien, Stephany)
August 31, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Members Trust of the Southwest Federal Credit Union. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JoanDavenport, 4)
August 29, 2023 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Edwards, George)
August 29, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE EDWARDS III on behalf of Marcia Meredith, Ros Dimere Inc., filed. (Edwards, George)
August 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-30427967) filed by Marcia Meredith, Ros Dimere Inc..(Sutarwalla, Murtaza)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meredith et al v. Members Trust of the Southwest Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Meredith
Represented By: George Edwards, IIl
Represented By: Murtaza Fakhruddin Sutarwalla
Represented By: Stephany Marie Simien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ros Dimere Inc.
Represented By: George Edwards, IIl
Represented By: Murtaza Fakhruddin Sutarwalla
Represented By: Stephany Marie Simien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Members Trust of the Southwest Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Scott L Scheinthal
Represented By: E.R. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?