United States of America v. Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc.
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: TRANSOCEAN OFFSHORE DEEPWATER DRILLING INC. and Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2023cv03317
Filed: September 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1319 Clean Water Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Scott M. Cernich to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(GabrielleLyons, 4)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Gregory F. Linsin to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified. (GlendaHassan, 4)
September 22, 2023 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc., filed.(Huber, Joshua)
September 20, 2023 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United States Of America, filed.(Hu, Daniel)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/12/2024 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(HeatherCarr, 4)
September 7, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Gregory F. Linsin (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30472798) by TRANSOCEAN OFFSHORE DEEPWATER DRILLING INC., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/28/2023. (Linsin, Gregory)
September 6, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Scott M. Cernich (Fee Exempt) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/27/2023. (Hu, Daniel)
September 6, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF LODGING OF PROPOSED CONSENT DECREE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Consent Decree)(Hu, Daniel)
September 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TRANSOCEAN OFFSHORE DEEPWATER DRILLING INC. filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hu, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Represented By: Scott M Cernich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANSOCEAN OFFSHORE DEEPWATER DRILLING INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory F Linsin, I
Represented By: Joshua Andrew Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?