Cyanco International, LLC v. Minerales de Occidente, S.A. de C.V.
Plaintiff: Cyanco International, LLC
Defendant: Minerales de Occidente, S.A. de C.V.
Case Number: 4:2023cv03713
Filed: October 3, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Cyanco International, LLC, filed.(Joyner, Samuel)
October 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cyanco International, LLC identifying Cyanco Holding Corporation as Corporate Parent, filed.(Joyner, Samuel)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/14/2023 at 10:30 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(RebeccaBecknal, 4)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Minerales de Occidente, S.A. de C.V.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(RhondaMooreKonieczny, 4)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Minerales de Occidente, S.A. de C.V., filed.(Joyner, Samuel)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cyanco International, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-30604936) filed by Cyanco International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Joyner, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cyanco International, LLC v. Minerales de Occidente, S.A. de C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cyanco International, LLC
Represented By: Samuel E. Joyner, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minerales de Occidente, S.A. de C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?