Escobar v. The Kroger Company et al
Plaintiff: Eluvia Escobar
Defendant: The Kroger Company and Kroger Texas L.P.
Case Number: 4:2024cv01906
Filed: May 20, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. The Order referring the case is WITHDRAWN. Magistrate Judge Andrew M. Edison remains designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified. (jg4)
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified. (knp4)
June 6, 2024 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kroger Texas L.P., The Kroger Company, filed. (Savo, Nadia)
June 5, 2024 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Eluvia Escobar, filed. (Brown, Paige)
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Paige Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified. (KimberlyPicota, 4)
May 23, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Paige E. Brown (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-31664252) by Eluvia Escobar, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/13/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pending Application for Admission to Practice) (Brown, Paige )
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/4/2024 at 09:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified. (rrb4)
May 20, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 165th District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2024-24661 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXSDC-31646768) filed by Kroger Texas L.P., The Kroger Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit D-1, #6 Exhibit D-2, #7 Exhibit D-3, #8 Exhibit D-4) (Greene, Adraon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Escobar v. The Kroger Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Company
Represented By: Nadia F Savo
Represented By: Adraon DelJohn Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Texas L.P.
Represented By: Nadia F Savo
Represented By: Adraon DelJohn Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eluvia Escobar
Represented By: Paige Elizabeth Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?