Rodriguez v. Central Transport, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Rodriguez
Defendant: BASF CORPORATION, Central Transport, LLC, Greif Inc and Delta Petroleum Co., Inc.
Case Number: 4:2024cv02022
Filed: May 29, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2024 Filing 20 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Greif Inc, filed. (Nebel, Roger)
July 1, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Reply to Response by Greif Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Nicholas Kaufman, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Original Petition) (Nebel, Roger)
June 27, 2024 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Greif Inc, filed. (Nebel, Roger)
June 24, 2024 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Anthony Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Armstrong, Scott)
June 21, 2024 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal by BASF Corporation, filed. (Gase, Stephanie)
June 14, 2024 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Anthony Rodriguez, filed. (Bradle, David)
June 14, 2024 Filing 14 First AMENDED ANSWER to by Central Transport, LLC, filed. (Ellington, Owen)
June 14, 2024 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Delta Petroleum Co., Inc. identifying Greif, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed. (Pollard, Bryan)
June 14, 2024 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BASF Corporation identifying BASF USA Holding LLC as Corporate Parent, filed. (Gase, Stephanie)
June 14, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of attorney substitution by BASF Corporation. Attorney Mukul S Kelkar terminated, filed. (Gase, Stephanie)
June 14, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie L. Gase on behalf of BASF Corporation, filed. (Gase, Stephanie)
June 10, 2024 Filing 9 STIPULATION re: Deadline to Answer by Greif Inc, filed. (Nebel, Roger)
June 10, 2024 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Greif Inc, filed. (Nebel, Roger)
June 10, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Greif Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/1/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2023 Public Info Report - Delta Petroleum Co Inc.pdf, #2 Proposed Order) (Nebel, Roger)
June 5, 2024 Filing 6 STIPULATION re: Stipulation by Central Transport, LLC, filed. (Brenton, Ruth)
June 4, 2024 Filing 5 STIPULATION re: (Joint) to Extend BASF Corporation's Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond by BASF Corporation, filed. (Kelkar, Mukul)
June 4, 2024 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Delta Petroleum Co., Inc., filed. (Pollard, Bryan)
May 31, 2024 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Central Transport, LLC identifying LTL Holding Company, LLC as Corporate Parent, filed. (Ellington, Owen)
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/7/2024 at 10:30 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Richard W Bennett. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified. (rrb4)
May 29, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 334th Judicial District Court, case number 2024-27047 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXSDC-31689025) filed by BASF CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 01 - State Court Filings, #2 Exhibit Ex 02 - State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Ex 03 - Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit Ex 04 - Index, #5 Exhibit Ex 05 - List of Counsel) (Kelkar, Mukul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Central Transport, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF CORPORATION
Represented By: Stephanie LeeAnn Gase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Transport, LLC
Represented By: Ruth Ann Brenton
Represented By: Owen H Ellington, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greif Inc
Represented By: Roger Henry Nebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Petroleum Co., Inc.
Represented By: Bryan D Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Rodriguez
Represented By: Scott Parker Armstrong
Represented By: David Duane Bradle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?