Hodges v. U.S. Bank as Trustee
Plaintiff: Alvin Hodges
Defendant: U.S. Bank as Trustee
Case Number: 4:2025cv00260
Filed: January 22, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Referring Judge: Richard W Bennett
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2025 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief In Support Motions referred to Richard W Bennett. by U.S. Bank as Trustee, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/26/2025. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) (Turner, Helen)
February 25, 2025 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Alvin Hodges, filed. (Medearis, David Miller)
February 25, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time Answer due by 3/7/2025.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard W Bennett) Parties notified. (svj4)
February 25, 2025 CONTINUATION OF ENTRY #8 FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard W Bennett) Parties notified. (svj4)
February 24, 2025 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise RespondMotions referred to Richard W Bennett. by U.S. Bank as Trustee, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/17/2025. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Extend Defendant's Deadline to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond) (Turner, Helen)
January 24, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE of Referral of Case to Magistrate Judge Richard W. Bennett, filed. (gc4)
January 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/7/2025 at 10:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Richard W Bennett. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard W Bennett) Parties notified. (gc4)
January 24, 2025 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE Regarding Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. Parties notified, filed. (gc4)
January 24, 2025 Referral Judge Selected: Magistrate Judge Richard W. Bennett randomly selected to receive referrals. An order or notice of referral of case or motion to follow. (gc4)
January 22, 2025 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U.S. Bank National Association, Successor in Interest to Bank of America, National Association, Successor by Merger to LaSalle Bank National Association as Trustee for GSAMP Trust 2007-NC1 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-NC1 identifying U.S. Bancorp as Corporate Parent, filed. (Turner, Helen)
January 22, 2025 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by U.S. Bank National Association, Successor in Interest to Bank of America, National Association, Successor by Merger to LaSalle Bank National Association as Trustee for GSAMP Trust 2007-NC1 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-NC1, filed. (Turner, Helen)
January 22, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 295th Judicial District Court, Harris County, Texas, case number 2024-76936 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXSDC-32791615) filed by U.S. Bank National Association, Successor in Interest to Bank of America, National Association, Successor by Merger to LaSalle Bank National Association as Trustee for GSAMP Trust 2007-NC1 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-NC1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (Turner, Helen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hodges v. U.S. Bank as Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Hodges
Represented By: David Miller Medearis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank as Trustee
Represented By: Helen Onome Turner
Represented By: Robert T Mowrey
Represented By: Benjamin David Lee Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?