Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Parker et al
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Bernardine Parker and Kathleen C. Parker
Case Number: 4:2025cv00288
Filed: January 23, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2025 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Kathleen C. Parker served on 1/24/2025, answer due 3/25/2025, filed. (Moore, Linda)
February 12, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 4/10/2025 at 10:30 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo, filed. (clf4)
February 3, 2025 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Bernardine Parker served on 1/24/2025, answer due 3/25/2025, filed. (Moore, Linda)
January 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/22/2025 at 10:30 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified. (bmn4)
January 24, 2025 Filing 3 CLERKS NOTICE Regarding Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. Parties notified, filed. (bmn4)
January 24, 2025 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, filed. (Moore, Linda)
January 24, 2025 Referral Judge Selected: Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo randomly selected to receive referrals. The selected Magistrate Judge is not assigned to this case until a District Judge refers the case or a motion or the parties consent to jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge. Once a referral has been made, the name of the referral judge will appear at the top of the docket sheet. (bmn4)
January 23, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in Interpleader against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXSDC-32806089) filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Civil Cover Sheet) (Moore, Linda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Parker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Linda G Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernardine Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen C. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?