Owens v. Solar Mosaic LLC
Plaintiff: Nichole Owens
Defendant: Solar Mosaic LLC
Case Number: 4:2025cv00305
Filed: January 24, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Stay Action Pending Arbitration. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified. (knp4)
February 20, 2025 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Stay Action Pending Arbitration by Nichole Owens, Solar Mosaic LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/13/2025. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Jones, Taneska)
February 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Brad Ponder to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified. (knp4)
February 12, 2025 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Nichole Owens, filed. (Schwartz, Robert)
February 11, 2025 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Solar Mosaic LLC, filed. (Jones, Taneska)
January 31, 2025 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brad Ponder (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-32849592) by Nichole Owens, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/21/2025. (Schwartz, Robert)
January 31, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Answer due by 2/28/2025.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified. (knp4)
January 29, 2025 Filing 6 Certificate of Service (Notice re Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge, Order for Conference and Disclosure of Interested Parties) by Solar Mosaic LLC, filed. (Jones, Taneska)
January 29, 2025 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Original Petition by Solar Mosaic LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/19/2025. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Original Petition) (Jones, Taneska)
January 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/17/2025 at 10:15 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified. (bmn4)
January 28, 2025 Filing 3 CLERKS NOTICE Regarding Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. Parties notified, filed. (bmn4)
January 28, 2025 Referral Judge Selected: Magistrate Judge Peter Bray randomly selected to receive referrals. The selected Magistrate Judge is not assigned to this case until a District Judge refers the case or a motion or the parties consent to jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge. Once a referral has been made, the name of the referral judge will appear at the top of the docket sheet. (bmn4)
January 24, 2025 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Solar Mosaic LLC identifying Mosaic Sustainable Finance Corporation as Corporate Parent, filed. (Jones, Taneska)
January 24, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fort Bend County Judicial District Court, case number 24-DCV-323497 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXSDC-32814216) filed by Solar Mosaic LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Index of Matters Being Filed, #2 Exhibit B- Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C- Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit D- Original Petition, #5 Exhibit E- Citation, #6 Exhibit F- Affidavit of Service, #7 Exhibit G- Counsel of Record) (Jones, Taneska)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens v. Solar Mosaic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nichole Owens
Represented By: Robert A. Schwartz
Represented By: Brad Ponder
Represented By: Brad Ponder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solar Mosaic LLC
Represented By: Taneska L Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?