Newton v. TM Senior Living LLC d/b/a Fountainwood at Lake Houston et al
Plaintiff: Darlene F Newton
Defendant: MedCore Partners LLC, Integral Senior Living Management LLC, Mark Kennedy and TM Senior Living LLC doing business as Fountainwood at Lake Houston
Case Number: 4:2025cv00686
Filed: February 17, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 451 Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for TM Senior Living LLC 4/25/2025.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified. (knp4)
April 4, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for Integral Senior Living Management LLC 5/2/2025.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified. (knp4)
April 3, 2025 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time File Answer or Responsive Pleading by Integral Senior Living Management LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/24/2025. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Corpuz, Victor)
April 3, 2025 Filing 9 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by MedCore Partners LLC, TM Senior Living LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/24/2025. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint) (Cooper, Elliott)
April 1, 2025 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Integral Senior Living Management LLC served on 3/14/2025, answer due 4/4/2025; MedCore Partners LLC served on 3/14/2025, answer due 4/4/2025; TM Senior Living LLC served on 3/14/2025, answer due 4/4/2025, filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Affidavit of Service) (Azam, Ahmad)
March 12, 2025 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Integral Senior Living Management LLC, MedCore Partners LLC, TM Senior Living LLC d/b/a Fountainwood at Lake Houston. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (rlm4)
March 10, 2025 Filing 6 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action, #2 Summons in a Civil Action) (Azam, Ahmad)
March 10, 2025 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Darlene F Newton, filed. (Azam, Ahmad)
March 10, 2025 Summons Not Issued as to Integral Senior Living Management LLC, MedCore Partners LLC, TM Senior Living LLC d/b/a Fountainwood at Lake Houston due to these deficiencies: Style do not match case. Attorney or Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by NEF, filed. (mew4)
March 7, 2025 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Request for Summons in a Civil Action, #2 Request for Summons in a Civil Action) (Azam, Ahmad)
February 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/21/2025 at 10:30 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified. (hlc4)
February 20, 2025 Filing 2 CLERKS NOTICE Regarding Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. Parties notified, filed. (hlc4)
February 20, 2025 Referral Judge Selected: Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo randomly selected to receive referrals. The selected Magistrate Judge is not assigned to this case until a District Judge refers the case or a motion or the parties consent to jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge. Once a referral has been made, the name of the referral judge will appear at the top of the docket sheet. (hlc4)
February 17, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXSDC-32928054) filed by Darlene F Newton. (Azam, Ahmad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newton v. TM Senior Living LLC d/b/a Fountainwood at Lake Houston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene F Newton
Represented By: Ahmad Gassan Azam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MedCore Partners LLC
Represented By: Elliott Teale Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integral Senior Living Management LLC
Represented By: Victor Navasca Corpuz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TM Senior Living LLC doing business as Fountainwood at Lake Houston
Represented By: Elliott Teale Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?