Sampson v. Lyft, Inc.
Plaintiff: Iamman R. Sampson
Defendant: Lyft, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2025cv00786
Filed: February 18, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Christina A Bryan
Referring Judge: Charles Eskridge
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 7/2/2025 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 1/28/2026. Pltf Expert Report due by 1/28/2026. Deft Expert Witness List due by 2/27/2026. Deft Expert Report due by 2/27/2026. Discovery due by 4/13/2026. Mediation due by 6/29/2026. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 5/13/2026. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 5/13/2026. Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/29/2026. Docket Call set for 9/22/2026 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Charles Eskridge (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan) Parties notified. (mem4)
March 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/2/2025 at 11:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified. (mem4)
March 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christina A. Bryan (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (jmg4)
March 3, 2025 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Lyft, Inc. served on 2/27/2025, answer due 3/20/2025, filed. (bmn4)
February 23, 2025 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (abb4)
February 23, 2025 Filing 2 CLERKS NOTICE Regarding Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. Parties notified, filed. (abb4)
February 23, 2025 Referral Judge Selected: Magistrate Judge Christina A. Bryan randomly selected to receive referrals. The selected Magistrate Judge is not assigned to this case until a District Judge refers the case or a motion or the parties consent to jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge. Once a referral has been made, the name of the referral judge will appear at the top of the docket sheet. (abb4)
February 23, 2025 Summons Issued as to Lyft, Inc. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed. Per IFP Order, Summons and USM-285 issued and handled delivered to USMS on 02/24/2025 for execution of service. (abb4)
February 18, 2025 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Iamman R. Sampson, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/11/2025. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Hearing) (abb4)
February 18, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lyft, Inc. filed by Iamman R. Sampson. Application to Proceed IFP Granted on February 28, 2025 by Judge Charles R. Eskridge. (abb4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sampson v. Lyft, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iamman R. Sampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyft, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?