Johnson v. O'Rourke et al
Plaintiff: R. Wayne Johnson
Defendant: Mary J. Schoelen, Emile Dufrene, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, Bee County, Texas, Amanda L. Meredith, Texas Board Of Criminal Justice, Peter O'Rourke, Amy Berman Jackson, Robert N. Davis, A. Ortiz, Margaret Bartley, Texas Board of Pardons and Paroles, C. Washington, Brett M. Kavanaugh and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 5:2018cv00124
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Diana Saldana
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition to #5 MOTION to Remand, filed by Bee County, Texas. (Cullen, Casey)
October 9, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition to #5 MOTION to Remand, filed by Margaret Bartley, Robert N. Davis, Emile Dufrene, Amanda L. Meredith, Peter O'Rourke, A. Ortiz, Mary J. Schoelen, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, C. Washington. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vela, Jose)
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Margaret Bartley, Robert N. Davis, Emile Dufrene, Amanda L. Meredith, Mary J. Schoelen, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vela, Jose)
October 2, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Bee County, Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cullen, Casey)
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by R. Wayne Johnson, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/9/2018. (ehernandez, 5)
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Original Petition, First Amended Petition, and Second Amended Petition by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Vela, Jose)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Substitute Party United States of America in place of United States Department of Veterans Affairs, Peter O'Rourke, A. Ortiz, C. Washington by United States Department of Veterans Affairs, Peter O'Rourke, A. Ortiz, C. Washington, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Vela, Jose)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Casey T. Cullen on behalf of Bee County, Texas, filed. (Cullen, Casey)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 341st Judicial District, Webb County, Texas, case number 2018CVK001331D3 () filed by United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Vela, Jose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. O'Rourke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary J. Schoelen
Represented By: Jose Vela, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emile Dufrene
Represented By: Jose Vela, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Represented By: Jose Vela, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bee County, Texas
Represented By: Casey Terrence Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda L. Meredith
Represented By: Jose Vela, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Board Of Criminal Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter O'Rourke
Represented By: Jose Vela, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Berman Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert N. Davis
Represented By: Jose Vela, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Ortiz
Represented By: Jose Vela, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Bartley
Represented By: Jose Vela, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Board of Pardons and Paroles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Washington
Represented By: Jose Vela, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett M. Kavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Jose Vela, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Wayne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?