Felipe Elizondo v. Precision Group Energy Services, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Felipe Elizondo
Defendant: PRECISION GROUP ENERGY SERVICES, INC. and Haroeel A. Godinez
Case Number: 5:2018cv00151
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Texas Southern District Court
0 Judge: John A Kazen
1 Judge: Marina Garcia Marmolejo
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2018 22 Featured Case ORDER ON CLOSING DOCUMENTS The Court ORDERS the parties to file closing documents (i.e., a stipulated dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41, signed by counsel for both parties) no later than January 24, 2019. Or in the alternative, the parties shall file an advisory notifying the Court as to why the deadline could not be met despite the due diligence of counsel. (Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified.(dmorales, 5)
December 7, 2018 21 NOTICE of Settlement by Felipe Elizondo, filed. (Alexander, William)
November 15, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John A. Kazen. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/15/2018. Regarding the Joint Motion for Continuance of Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, which is premised on the parties' intent to engage in mediation, the parties informed the Court that they have scheduled mediation with a private mediator for 11/28/2018. The Court will issue an order GRANTING the parties' Joint Motion for Continuance and will order the parties to file an advisory no later than 12/07/2018 regarding the status of settlement negotiations. If the case does not settle at the scheduled mediation, the Court will schedule an initial pretrial and scheduling conference shortly thereafter. The Court informed the parties that the Court is also available to conduct mediation and settlement conferences in the event the case does not settle with the private mediator. Telephonic Appearances: Clifton Alexander f/PLAINTIFF. Carlos Flores f/DEFENDANTS. (3:11 - 3:19). Appearances:(ERO:Anabel Pottin), filed.(JessicaGRodriguez, 5)
November 15, 2018 20 Featured Case ORDER granting #17 Motion for Continuance. Additionally, the Court ORDERS the parties to file a joint advisory no later than December 7, 2018 at 5:00 p.m. to apprise the Court of the outcome of the mediation and the status of settlement negotiations.(Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified.(gsalinas, 5)
November 14, 2018 19 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. The Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference set for November 15, 2018 at 3:00 p.m. is canceled, and a telephonic status conference is set for same time and date to discuss the parties efforts to schedule mediation. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the telephone conference call. When all parties are joined in the call, the parties may reach the Court at (956) 790-1757. (dflores, 5)
November 14, 2018 18 ***DOCKETED IN ERROR***NOTICE of Resetting. The Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference set for November 15, 2018 at 3:00 p.m. is canceled, and a telephonic status conference is set for same time and date to discuss the parties efforts to schedule mediation. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the telephone conference call. When all parties are joined in the call, the parties may reach the Court at (956) 790-1757.Parties notified. (dflores, 5) Modified on 11/14/2018 (dflores, 5).
November 14, 2018 17 Joint MOTION for Continuance of Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference Until After MediationMotions referred to John A Kazen. by Felipe Elizondo, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Alexander, William)
November 6, 2018 16 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Felipe Elizondo, filed.(Alexander, William)
November 1, 2018 15 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Haroeel A. Godinez, PRECISION GROUP ENERGY SERVICES, INC., filed.(Flores, Carlos)
October 31, 2018 14 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Felipe Elizondo, filed.(Alexander, William)
October 16, 2018 13 Featured Case ORDER FOR CONFERENCE AND DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Initial Conference set for 11/15/2018 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge John A. Kazen. (Signed by Magistrate Judge John A. Kazen). Parties notified. (mxperez, 5) Modified on 10/18/2018 (dflores, 5).
October 12, 2018 12 Case transferred in from Texas Western. Case Number 5:18-cv-00597; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
October 5, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION & TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, LAREDO DIVISION re #10 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case To Southern District of Texas, Laredo Division filed by Felipe Elizondo. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (wg)
October 4, 2018 10 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case To Southern District of Texas, Laredo Division by Felipe Elizondo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Alexander, William)
October 4, 2018 Featured Case Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Response due on or before Oct. 8, 2018. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc)
October 3, 2018 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for improper MOTION to Change Venue by Felipe Elizondo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Alexander, William)
September 14, 2018 8 Featured Case Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Parties shall submit a scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (wg)
September 13, 2018 7 Precision Group Energy Services, Inc. and Haroeel A. Godinezs ANSWER to Complaint by Haroeel A. Godinez, Precision Group Energy Services, Inc..(Martinez, Adolfo)
September 13, 2018 6 ***WITHDRAWN PER COURT ORDER ****MOTION to Dismiss for improper, MOTION to Change Venue by Haroeel A. Godinez. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support DEFENDANTS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(3) AND ALTERNATIVELY, DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE, #2 Proposed Order ORDER ON DEFENDANTS OPPOSED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(3) AND ALTERNATIVELY DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE)(Martinez, Adolfo) Modified on 10/5/2018 (wg).
August 28, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Felipe Elizondo. Precision Group Energy Services, Inc. served on 8/24/2018, answer due 9/14/2018. (Alexander, William)
August 28, 2018 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Felipe Elizondo. Haroeel A. Godinez served on 8/24/2018, answer due 9/14/2018. (Alexander, William)
June 18, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Haroeel A. Godinez, Precision Group Energy Services, Inc.. (wg)
June 15, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer. (rg)
June 15, 2018 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg)
June 15, 2018 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Felipe Elizondo. (Alexander, William)
June 15, 2018 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-10909300), filed by Felipe Elizondo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Felipe Elizondo Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alexander, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Felipe Elizondo v. Precision Group Energy Services, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRECISION GROUP ENERGY SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Carlos Evaristo Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haroeel A. Godinez
Represented By: Adolfo Gerardo Martinez
Represented By: Carlos Evaristo Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felipe Elizondo
Represented By: Lauren E. Braddy
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Alan Clifton Gordon
Represented By: Jeffrey W Hastings
Represented By: Carter Tilden Hastings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?