Soto et al v. Ruiz Fonseca
Plaintiff: Esmeralda Soto and Eligo Ortiz, Jr.
Defendant: Juan Carlos Ruiz Fonseca and Transportes De Carga Fema SA de CV
Case Number: 5:2019cv00064
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John A Kazen
Referring Judge: Marina Garcia Marmolejo
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Esmeralda Soto, filed.(Martinez, Edwardo)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Juan Carlos Ruiz Fonseca, filed.(Pope, William)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. The Court GRANTS Andrew Toscano's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in Charge #3 . Mr. Toscano is withdrawn as counsel for Plaintiffs. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of the Court to remove Andrew E. Toscano from the docket sheet and to update the docket sheet to reflect that Edwardo D. Martinez, III is the counsel-in-charge for each Plaintiff. (Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Andrew Toscano to Withdraw as AttorneyMotions referred to John A Kazen. by Esmeralda Soto, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Martinez, Edwardo)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER FOR CONFERENCE AND DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference set for 7/17/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge John A. Kazen. (Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 406th Webb County, case number 2019CVA000322D4 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22402180) filed by Juan Carlos Ruiz Fonseca. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Defendant Fonseca's List of All Counsel of Record, #3 Exhibit Defendant Fonseca's Index of Matters Being Files)(Pope, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soto et al v. Ruiz Fonseca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Carlos Ruiz Fonseca
Represented By: William L Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transportes De Carga Fema SA de CV
Represented By: William L Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esmeralda Soto
Represented By: Andrew Eugene Toscano
Represented By: Edwardo David Martinez, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eligo Ortiz, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew Eugene Toscano
Represented By: Edwardo David Martinez, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?