Olivares v. Royal Freight, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Juan Jesus Olivares
Defendant: Royal Freight, Inc. and Sarmad H. Sawa
Case Number: 5:2019cv00093
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John A Kazen
Referring Judge: Diana Saldana
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference is RESET to 9/19/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge John A. Kazen, filed. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessie J. Ormand on behalf of Juan Jesus Olivares, filed. (Hagood, Gene)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR CONFERENCE AND DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference set for 9/17/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge John A. Kazen. (Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Royal Freight, Inc., Sarmad H. Sawa, filed.(Barrera, Eric)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Juan Jesus Olivares, filed.(Hagood, Gene)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Royal Freight, Inc., Sarmad H. Sawa, filed.(Barrera, Eric)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Royal Freight, Inc., filed.(Barrera, Eric)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 406th District Court, case number 2019-CVA-000495-D4 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22747914) filed by Sarmad H. Sawa, Royal Freight, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Barrera, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olivares v. Royal Freight, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Freight, Inc.
Represented By: Eric I Barrera
Represented By: Ewing Edben Sikes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarmad H. Sawa
Represented By: Eric I Barrera
Represented By: Ewing Edben Sikes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Jesus Olivares
Represented By: Gene Stuart Hagood
Represented By: Jessie Joyce Ormand
Represented By: Ryan David King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?