Bruni et al v. Hughs
Plaintiff: DCCC, Sylvia Bruni, DSCC, Texas Democratic Party and Jessica Tiedt
Defendant: Ruth Hughs
Amicus Curiae: Honest Elections Project
Cross Claimant: Michael Idrogo
Case Number: 5:2020cv00035
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marina Garcia Marmolejo
Referring Judge: Diana Song Quiroga
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition to #32 MOTION to Dismiss #16 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. , filed by Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Democratic Party, Jessica Tiedt. (Howton, Skyler)
May 1, 2020 Filing 46 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess PagesMotions referred to Diana Song Quiroga. by Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Democratic Party, Jessica Tiedt, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Howton, Skyler)
May 1, 2020 Filing 45 Joint MOTION for Scheduling OrderMotions referred to Diana Song Quiroga. by Ruth Hughs, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Disher, Todd)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(EricaLopez, 5)
April 23, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Lawrence Disher on behalf of Ruth Hughs, filed. (Disher, Todd)
April 17, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus CuriaeMotions referred to Diana Song Quiroga. by Honest Elections Project, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Appendix Propsoed Amicus Curiae Brief)(Holt, Dallin)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Exhibit A is hereby STRUCK from the record..(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(EricaLopez, 5)
April 13, 2020 Filing 40 Letter from Attorney General of Texas, filed. (EricaLopez, 5)
April 13, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce V. Spiva on behalf of Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Democratic Party, Jessica Tiedt, filed. (Spiva, Bruce)
April 13, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Osher on behalf of Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Democratic Party, Jessica Tiedt, filed. (Osher, Daniel)
April 13, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily R. Brailey on behalf of Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Democratic Party, Jessica Tiedt, filed. (Brailey, Emily)
April 13, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc E. Elias on behalf of Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Democratic Party, Jessica Tiedt, filed. (Elias, Marc)
April 13, 2020 Filing 35 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE by Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Democratic Party, Jessica Tiedt on 04/08/2020 re: Summons, First Amended Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief and Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed.(Howton, Skyler)
April 13, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Lalitha Madduri on behalf of Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Democratic Party, Jessica Tiedt, filed. (Madduri, Lalitha)
April 10, 2020 Filing 33 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunctionMotions referred to Diana Song Quiroga. by Ruth Hughs, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A, #2 Proposed Order)(Bangert, Ryan)
April 10, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss #16 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Ruth Hughs, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/1/2020. (Bangert, Ryan)
April 10, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by William T. Thompson on behalf of Ruth Hughs, filed. (Thompson, William)
April 9, 2020 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess PagesMotions referred to Diana Song Quiroga. by Ruth Hughs, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bangert, Ryan)
April 8, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Filing of Corrected Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Democratic Party, Jessica Tiedt, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Howton, Skyler)
April 8, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Filing of Correction to Expert Declaration of Allan J. Lichtman by Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Democratic Party, Jessica Tiedt, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Correction to Declaration of Allan J. Lichtman)(Howton, Skyler)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(EricaLopez, 5)
March 31, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan L. Bangert on behalf of Ruth Hughs, filed. (Bangert, Ryan)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Stephanie Command to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(EricaLopez, 5)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Lalitha D. Madduri to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(EricaLopez, 5)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Emily Brailey to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(EricaLopez, 5)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Daniel Osher to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(EricaLopez, 5)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Bruce V. Spiva to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(EricaLopez, 5)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Marc E. Elias to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(EricaLopez, 5)
March 30, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Democratic Party, Jessica Tiedt, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix I to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Appendix II to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Appendix III to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Appendix IV to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Appendix V to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #6 Appendix VI to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #7 Appendix VII to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #8 Appendix VIII to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #9 Appendix IX to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #10 Appendix X to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #11 Appendix XI to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #12 Appendix XII to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #13 Appendix XIII to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #14 Appendix XIV to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #15 Appendix XV to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #16 Proposed Order)(Howton, Skyler)
March 30, 2020 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess PagesMotions referred to Diana Song Quiroga. by Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Democratic Party, Jessica Tiedt, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Memo of Law in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Proposed Order)(Howton, Skyler)
March 30, 2020 Summons Issued as to Ruth Hughs. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(FernandoVilla, 5)
March 27, 2020 Filing 17 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Ruth Hughs, filed.(Howton, Skyler)
March 27, 2020 Filing 16 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ruth Hughs filed by DCCC, Sylvia Bruni, DSCC, Texas Democratic Party, Jessica Tiedt.(Howton, Skyler)
March 25, 2020 Filing 14 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Ruth Hughs served on 3/17/2020, answer due 4/7/2020, filed. (Attachments: #1 Ex A-Summons Served, #2 Ex B-Certified Mail Receipt)(Howton, Skyler)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Striking Document re: #12 Complaint. The document does not comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Clerk is DIRECTED to strike it from the record.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified.(gsalinas, 5)
March 18, 2020 Filing 12 CROSS COMPLAINT against Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Ruth Hughs, Texas Democratic Party filed by Michael Idrogo. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CindyMiranda, 5)
March 9, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Stephanie Command to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to Diana Song Quiroga. by Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Democratic Party, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Howton, Skyler)
March 9, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Lalitha D. Madduri to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to Diana Song Quiroga. by Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Democratic Party, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Howton, Skyler)
March 9, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Emily Brailey to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to Diana Song Quiroga. by Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Democratic Party, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Howton, Skyler)
March 9, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Daniel Osher to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to Diana Song Quiroga. by Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Democratic Party, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Howton, Skyler)
March 9, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Bruce V. Spiva to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to Diana Song Quiroga. by Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Democratic Party, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Howton, Skyler)
March 9, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Marc E. Elias to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to Diana Song Quiroga. by Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Democratic Party, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Howton, Skyler)
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad Dunn on behalf of Texas Democratic Party, filed. (Dunn, Chad)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge John A. Kazen recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5)
March 9, 2020 Summons Issued as to Ruth Hughs. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(dmorales, 5)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Democratic Party, filed.(Howton, Skyler)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Democratic Party, filed.(Howton, Skyler)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ruth Hughs (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24337802) filed by DCCC, Sylvia Bruni, DSCC, Texas Democratic Party. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Howton, Skyler)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruni et al v. Hughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Hughs
Represented By: Todd Lawrence Disher
Represented By: William Thomas Thompson
Represented By: Ryan L Bangert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DCCC
Represented By: Skyler Michelle Howton
Represented By: Lalitha Madduri
Represented By: Emily Brailey
Represented By: Marc Elias
Represented By: Bruce Spiva
Represented By: Daniel Osher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Bruni
Represented By: Skyler Michelle Howton
Represented By: Lalitha Madduri
Represented By: Emily Brailey
Represented By: Marc Elias
Represented By: Bruce Spiva
Represented By: Daniel Osher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DSCC
Represented By: Skyler Michelle Howton
Represented By: Lalitha Madduri
Represented By: Emily Brailey
Represented By: Marc Elias
Represented By: Bruce Spiva
Represented By: Daniel Osher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas Democratic Party
Represented By: Skyler Michelle Howton
Represented By: Lalitha Madduri
Represented By: Chad W Dunn
Represented By: Emily Brailey
Represented By: Marc Elias
Represented By: Bruce Spiva
Represented By: Daniel Osher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Tiedt
Represented By: Skyler Michelle Howton
Represented By: Lalitha Madduri
Represented By: Emily Brailey
Represented By: Marc Elias
Represented By: Bruce Spiva
Represented By: Daniel Osher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Honest Elections Project
Represented By: Dallin Brockbank Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Michael Idrogo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?